Valley Air Service, Inc. v. Southaire, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2006cv00782
Filed: February 10, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Referring Judge: Michael T. Mason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 378 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/6/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 15, 2009 359 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/15/2009:(gcy, )
April 16, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 4/16/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Air Service, Inc. v. Southaire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?