Belbachir v. County of McHenry et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv01392
Filed: March 14, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 563 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/29/2012: For the reasons stated below, plaintiff's motion for judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) 543 is denied as moot. The Centegra Defendants' motion to r econsider 545 is denied. The court relinquishes supplemental jurisdiction over the negligence claim in Count VIII and the respondeat superior claim in Count XI and these claims are dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall enter on the court's orders 539 540 of September 28, 2012. This case is terminated. [For further details see order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
November 9, 2012 549 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 11/9/2012: For the reasons set forth below, the magistrate judges orders 174 220 in case number 08 C 50193 and 436 516 in case number 06 C 1392 are upheld as modified.[For further details see order.] Electronic notice(jat, )
January 31, 2012 464 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/31/2012: For the reasons stated below, defendants' motion to dismiss 370 is denied.[For further details see order.]Electronic notice(jat, )
January 4, 2012 436 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 1/4/2012: Plaintiff's motion to unseal documents 382 is granted, in part. The court adopts the recommendations contained in the report prepared by the United States. The parties a re ordered to re-file appropriate documents electronically in the court file in conformity with this order. Appropriately redacted versions of all previously sealed motions, responses, and associated memoranda or exhibits are to be re-filed by Januar y 18, 2012. Parties are instructed to file items as an amended document on the CM/ECF system and link them back to the appropriate docket entry. Replies remain due February 3, 2012 and should be filed in conformity with this order and the government& #039;s report. The parties should not send courtesy copies to the court. The briefing schedule and timeline for the motions will not be affected by this order. All future filings should comply with the government's report until further order of the court. Parties have 14 days from service, as calculated under Rule 6, to file objections with Judge Reinhard pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. Any objection not made within the 14 day time frame may be waived for the purposes of appeal. Objections need not be presented as stated in L.R.5.3.[For further details see order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (jat, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belbachir v. County of McHenry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?