Lott v. Levitt et al Featured Case
Case Number: 1:2006cv02007
Filed: April 10, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 07-3095 consisting of one (1) volume of pleadings; seven (7) volumes of transcripts and one (1) volume of exhibits. (jmp, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 10/21/2008; Decided 2/11/2009 in USCA case no. 07-3095. (td, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MANDATE of USCA dated 2/11/2009 regarding notice of appeal 73 ; USCA No. 07-3095. The judgment of the District Court is affirmed, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (td, )
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 07-3095 consisting of one volume of pleadings, seven volumes of transcripts, and one volume of exhibits. (td, )
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 USCA RECEIVED on 11/5/07 the supplemental record on appeal. (rbf, )
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 73 (USCA no. 07-3095) consisting of 1 volume of transcripts of proceedings held on 7/31/07 held before the Honorable Ruben Castillo. (rbf, )
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Ruben Castillo held on 7/31/07 (Volumes 1). (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED). (rbf, )
October 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 73 (USCA no. 07-3095) consisting of six (6) volumes of transcripts of proceedings before Judge Ruben Castillo held on 5/2/07, 6/8/07, 6/14/07, 7/17/07, 7/31/07, 8/23/07. (rbf, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Ruben Castillo held on 5/2/07, 6/8/07, 6/14/07, 7/17/07, 7/31/07, 8/23/07 (Volumes 6). (DOCUMENTS NOT SCANNED). (rbf, )
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 USCA RECEIVED on 9/20/07 the long record regarding notice of appeal 73 (07-3095)(dj, )
September 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 73 (USCA no. 07-3095) consisting of 1 volume of pleadings and 1 exhibit. (dj, )
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DESIGNATION by Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 07-3095 (Gove, Gail)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE by John R. Lott, Jr re designation of record on appeal 77 (Johnson, Mark)
September 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DESIGNATION by John R. Lott, Jr of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 07-3095 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Mark)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet. (DOCUMENT NOT SCANNED). (rbf, )
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DESIGNATION by John R. Lott, Jr of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 07-3095 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Johnson, Mark)
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 73 ; USCA Case No. 07-3095 (rbf, )
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on 8/31/07 notice of appeal 73 . Notified counsel (dj, )
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of appeal by John R. Lott, Jr regarding orders 71 , 62 , 28 , 27 , 72 , 70 ; Filing fee $ 455.00 paid; Receipt number 10341149 (dj, ) Modified on 10/31/2007 (air, ).
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/23/2007.(rbf, )
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Signed by Judge Ruben Castillo on 8/23/2007.(rbf, )
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Motion hearing held on 8/23/07. Enter Order. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint 60 is denied. Mailed notice (rbf, )
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr (Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave for File His First Amended Complaint (Freehling, Paul)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc., Steven D. Levitt re memorandum 67 With Certificate of Service (Metcalf, Slade)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM by Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Metcalf, Slade)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :This Court's earlier order is modified as follows. Count II of the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff will be allowed to pursue his motion for leave to file an amended complaint 60 . Defendant's response will be due 8/14/2007. Plaintiff's reply will be due 8/21/2007. The Court will rule on 8/23/2007 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (rao, )
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing set for 8/23/2007 is vacated. This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the Rule 41(a)(1) Stipulation of Dismissal of Count II of the Complaint filed on 8/3/2007. Mailed notice (rao, )
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal Rule 41(a)(1) Stipulation of Dismissal of Count II of the Complaint (Johnson, Mark)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :The trial date is stricken.Mailed notice (slb, )
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of dismissal of count I is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Response due 8/14/2007 to plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Reply due 8/21/2007. Status hearing set for 8/23/2007 at 9:45a.m.Mailed notice (slb, )
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Mark L. Johnson for presentment of motion for leave to file 60 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/8/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Johnson, Mark)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr for leave to file amended complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit corrected)(Johnson, Mark)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr for leave to file Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Mark)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Motion by Mark L. Johnson for presentment of motion for reconsideration 57 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/8/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Johnson, Mark)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr for reconsideration dismissal of Count I (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Mark)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Settlement conference held in chambers on 7/18/2007. The parties are directed to notify this Court by 7/30/2007 if this case has been settled. Status hearing set for 7/31/2007 at 9:45 AM.Mailed notice (rao, )
July 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing held on 7/17/2007. The Court will hold a settlement conference in chambers on 7/18/2007 at 4:00 PM.Mailed notice (rao, )
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Motion hearing set for 7/11/07 is vacated. Thomas A. Vickers' motion to withdraw 49 as local counsel on behalf of plaintiff is granted. Attorney Thomas A. Vickers terminated.Mailed notice (rbf, )
July 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Vickers for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 49 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/11/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Vickers, Thomas)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED Protective Order Signed by Judge Ruben Castillo on 7/6/2007.(rbf, )
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr by Paul E. Freehling Amended Appearance (Freehling, Paul)
July 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr by Mark L. Johnson (Johnson, Mark)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr to withdraw as attorney (local counsel for Plaintiff) (Vickers, Thomas)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing held on 6/14/2007 and continued to 7/17/2007 at 9:45 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for protective order 41 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's corrected motion for protective order 42 is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Motion by respondent University of Chicago for protective order 45 is granted to the extent stated in open court. Motion hearing set for 6/19/2007 is vacated. Parties to submit an agreed protective order to chambers by 6/28/2007 or submit individual proposed protective orders to chambers by 7/6/2007.Mailed notice (rao, )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr by Paul E. Freehling (Freehling, Paul)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Motion by Jacob Maxwell Rubinstein for presentment of motion for protective order 45 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/19/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Rubinstein, Jacob)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION by Respondent University Of Chicago for protective order Preventing Disclosure of "Peer Referee" Identities and Other Confidential Information (Rubinstein, Jacob)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance University of Chicago (Rubinstein, Jacob)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Steven D. Levitt in Opposition to motion for protective order 42 (Thompson, Wade)
May 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr for protective order (Corrected) (Vickers, Thomas)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION by Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr for protective order (Vickers, Thomas)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing reset to 6/14/2007 at 9:45 AM. Status hearing set for 6/12/2007 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing held on 5/2/2007 and continued to 6/12/2007 at 9:45 AM. The parties are granted leave to proceed with all discovery. All discovery to be completed on or before 7/31/2007. Bench trial set for 10/1/2007 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (rao, )
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by Steven D. Levitt(Gove, Gail)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS Report (Joint Revised) by Steven D. Levitt (Gove, Gail)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by Steven D. Levitt(Gove, Gail)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Settlement conference held in chambers on 3/28/2007. The parties are requested to reevaluate their final settlement positions. Defendant's answer or amended pleadings by Plaintiff will be due on or before 4/30/2007. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 5/2/2007 at 9:45 AM. A firm litigation schedule will be set at the next status hearing.Mailed notice (rao, )
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :The settlement conference set for 3/28/2007 will begin at 10:30 AM.Mailed notice (rao, )
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Parties' oral request to reset the settlement conference is granted. Settlement conference reset to 3/28/2007 at 11:00 AM.Mailed notice (rao, )
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Settlement conference reset to 2/15/2007 at 2:00 p.m. Settlement conference set for 1/31/2007 is vacated. Defendant Levitt's agreed motion to extend time for defendant Levitt to respond to Count II 30 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Count II within 21 days of the settlement conference. Motion hearing set for 1/30/2007 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by David P. Sanders for presentment of extension of time 30 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/30/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Sanders, David)
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Steven D. Levitt for extension of time to Respond to Count II of the Complaint (Agreed Motion) (Sanders, David)
January 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Status hearing set for 1/24/2007 is vacated. Settlement conference set for 1/31/2007 at 1:30 PM. Clients with settlement authority are directed to appear or be available by telephone.Mailed notice (rao, )
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Ruben Castillo on 1/11/2007:Mailed notice(hp, )
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing set for 1/24/2007 at 9:45 a.m. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Defendant HarperCollins Publishers, Inc.'s motion to dismis Count I of Plaintiff's complaint 15 is granted. Defendant Levitt's motion to dismiss 16 is granted as to Count I and denied as to Count II. Defendant HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice (hp, )
July 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Metcalf, Slade)
July 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by John R. Lott, Jr in Opposition to motion to dismiss 15 , motion to dismiss 16 (Vickers, Thomas)
June 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing held. Plaintiff's response to defendant Harper/Collins Publishers, Inc.'s motion to dismiss 15 and defendant Steven D. Levitt's motion to dismiss 16 is due on or before 7/10/2006. Defendants' replies will be due on or before 7/24/2006. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice (rao, )
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. in Support of motion to dismiss 15 (Sanders, David)
June 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Steven D. Levitt in Support of motion to dismiss 16 (Sanders, David)
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 EXHIBIT 1 by Defendants to Defendant HarperCollins' motion to dismiss 19 (hp, )
June 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by all defendants of Filing Exhibit 1 in Defendant HarperCollins' Motion to Dismiss (Sanders, David)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John R. Lott, Jr by Stephen H. Marcus; Order entered granting leave by Ruben Castillo. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10717352 (hp, )
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT by Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Sanders, David)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by David P. Sanders for presentment of motion to dismiss 15 , motion to dismiss 16 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/8/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Sanders, David)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Steven D. Levitt to dismiss (Sanders, David)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. to dismiss (Sanders, David)
June 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS Report (Joint) by John R. Lott, Jr, Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (Sanders, David)
May 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. by Gail C. Gove; Order entered granting leave by Ruben Castillo. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10641668 (hp, )
May 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. by Slade R. Metcalf; Order entered granting leave by Ruben Castillo. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10641668 (hp, )
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Defendants' agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint 9 is granted. Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint on or before 6/5/2006. Motion hearing set for 5/24/2006 is vacated. Status report filing date of 6/5/2006 and status hearing set for 6/8/2006 at 9:45 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (rao, )
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by David P. Sanders for presentment of motion for extension of time 9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 5/24/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Sanders, David)
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. for extension of time to Answer or otherwise Plead to complaint (Agreed) (Sanders, David)
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. by Wade A Thompson (Thompson, Wade)
May 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. by David P. Sanders (Sanders, David)
May 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Parties to file a joint status report on or before 6/5/2006. Status hearing set for 6/8/2006 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (rao, )
April 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Steven D. Levitt, HarperCollins Publishers, Inc. (hp, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John R. Lott, Jr., by Thomas A. Vickers (hp, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (hp, )
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John R. Lott, Jr.,; Jury Demand.(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Levitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?