Russian Media Group, LLC v. Cable America, Inc. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv03578
Filed: June 30, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 367 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion; Sanctions for Defendants civil contempt are imposed as set out below. [ For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ph, )
August 17, 2010 360 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: Defendants and Intervenor's motion for leave to file amended affirmative defenses 345 is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/17/2010. Mailed notice (ph, )
February 19, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/19/2009. (aac, )
February 7, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge John W. Darrah on 2/7/2008.(ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russian Media Group, LLC v. Cable America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?