Chicago Park District, The v. Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Chicago Park District, The
Defendant: Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The and Chicago Bears Stadium LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2006cv03957
Filed: July 21, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Blanche M. Manning on 8/8/2006:Mailed notice(eav, )
August 4, 2006 Filing 18
NOTICE of Motion by Aaron H. Stanton for presentment of motion to stay15 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/8/2006 at 11:00 AM. (Stanton, Aaron)
August 2, 2006 Filing 14
Amended NOTICE of Motion by Patricia J Fokuo for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, motion to stay,, 12 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/8/2006 at 11:00 AM. (Fokuo, Patricia)
July 31, 2006 Filing 9
MOTION by Defendants Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Chicago Bears Stadium LLC, The to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, MOTION by Defendants Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Chicago Bears Stadium LLC, The to stay Pending Arbitration (Fokuo, Patricia)
July 28, 2006 Filing 6
MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 8/22/2006 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel should be prepared to advise the court regarding the progress of efforts to serve the defendants. Mailed notice (rth, )
July 24, 2006 Filing 5
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., c/o US Corporation Company, Chicago Bears Stadium LLC, c/o John Scholnick (hp, )
July 21, 2006 Filing 3
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Chicago Park District by Richard W. Burke, George J. Lynch, Aaron H. Stanton (hp, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicago Park District, The v. Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Park District, The
Represented By: Aaron H. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The
Represented By: Jay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bears Stadium LLC, The
Represented By: Jay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?