Adkins v. Wright

Case Number: 1:2006cv04834
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/20/2013: For the reasons stated below, Petitioner's application for leave to file his appeal in forma pauperis 47 is respectfully denied. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the Clerk of the Court of Appeals. Mailed notice(tbk, )
May 24, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/24/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
May 31, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/31/2011. Petitioner's request for leave to file an amended habeas petition 29 is granted, with the clarifications discussed below. The stay entered by Judge Andersen (see 9 12 ) is continued. For further details, see below. [ For further details see written opinion.] (ca, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?