Adams et al v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv04856
Filed: September 7, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2015 547 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Seneca Adams for judgment entry (Smith, Christopher)
June 10, 2014 496 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 6/10/2014. Mailed notice (td, )
March 9, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: For the reasons set out below, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant City to Respond to Discovery Regarding the City's Broken Disciplinary and Supervisory Systems 150 is denied as premature. Motion hearing date of 3/15/11 is stricken. Status hearing set for 3/24/11 at 9:30 a.m. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?