Sullivan v. Jamison

Case Number: 1:2006cv05240
Filed: September 27, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/8/2011: Plaintiffs-counter defendants, Frank Sullivan and Rude Music Inc. (collectively Sullivan), move for summary judgment on defendants-counter plaintiffs, Jimmy Jamison and Step han Ellis, counterclaim on the basis that neither Jamison nor Ellis disclosed their claims for any Survivor royalties when filing for bankruptcy protection. For the reasons that follow, Sullivans motion for summary judgment 82 is denied. Mailed notice (For further detail see Written Opinion) (nf, )
December 21, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion before Honorable Michael T. Mason: Plaintiff's motion for entry of a protective order 72 is denied. Counterclaimants' motion for protective order 73 is granted in part and denied in part. The 1/12/11 status hearing stands. (See Written Opinion for further detail) (rbf, )
December 1, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/1/2010:Mailed notice(keg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?