Gonzalez et al v. City of Elgin et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv05321
Filed: September 29, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/8/2010: The parties must bear their own costs based on the mixed outcome of this lawsuit. See Testa v. Village of Mundelein, Ill., 89 F.3d 443, 447 (7th Cir. 1996). [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 19, 2010 289 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/19/2010: The Court grants Defendants' motion in limine #8 and grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion in limine #10. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 16, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/16/2010: The Court grants Defendants' motions in limine #5 and #21. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 4, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion in limine #3. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (mw, )
July 29, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/29/2010: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #12 212 is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
July 23, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/23/2010: Plaintiffs' motion in limine number 16 216 is granted in part without prejudice and denied in part. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. City of Elgin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?