Grochocinski v. Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP et al Featured Case

Plaintiff as Chapter 7 Trustee for the bankruptcy estate of CMGT, Inc. filed suit against Mayer Brown Rowe and Maw, LLP, Ronald Given and Charles W. Trautner for legal malpractice. Plaintiff alleged that Mayer Brown advised CMGT not to respond to Spehar Capital's motion for TRO. As a result, Spehar obtained a TRO and later a default judgment against CMGT for $17 million. Spehar then used the $17 million default judgment to file an involuntary petition for bankruptcy against CMGT.

Plaintiff: David Grochocinski
Defendant: Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP and Ronald B Given
Case Number: 1:2006cv05486
Filed: October 10, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2013 Filing 271 MANDATE of USCA dated 7/15/2013 regarding notice of appeal 175 , notice of appeal 218 , notice of appeal 256 ; USCA No. 10-2057, 11-1393 & 11-3597. The grant of summary judgment in favor of the defendants is AFFIRMED, with costs. The denial of Mr. Spehar's motion to intervene and the denial of sanctions against the trustee and attorney Joyce is AFFIRMED. The above is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (jmp, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 1/16/2013; Decided 6/21/2013 in USCA case no. 10-2057. (jmp, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 269 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 10-2057. No record to be returned. (jmp, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 268 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/20/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Court Reporter Contact Information: April Metzler (419) 787-1832, april.courtreporter@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2012. (rp, )
March 20, 2012 Filing 267 USCA RECEIVED on March 19, 2012 the Supplemental record; Appeal no. 11-3597. (ao,)
March 19, 2012 Filing 266 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 256 (USCA no. 11-3597). (ao, )
March 17, 2012 Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/6/2010 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status Conference. Court Reporter Contact Information: April Metzler, april.courtreporter@gmail.com, 419-787-1832. <P>IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.</P> Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2012. (Metzler, April)
December 13, 2011 Filing 264 USCA RECEIVED on 12/13/2011 the original record on appeal record regarding notice of appeal 256 USCA Case No. 11-3597. (hp, )
December 12, 2011 Filing 263 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 256 (USCA no. 11-3597). (gel, )
November 30, 2011 Filing 262 DESIGNATION by David Grochocinski of record on appeal (Morgans, David)
November 30, 2011 Filing 261 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP (Novack, Stephen)
November 28, 2011 Filing 260 DESIGNATION by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 11-3597 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1)(Novack, Stephen)
November 23, 2011 Filing 259 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP (Novack, Stephen)
November 17, 2011 Filing 258 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 256 . Notified counsel (gel, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gel, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE of appeal by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP regarding orders 247 , 246 , 255 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-6570521. (Novack, Stephen)
October 17, 2011 Filing 255 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/17/2011: For these reasons, the Court orders Joyce to pay Mayer Brown $10,712.34 in attorneys' fees and $1,438.58 in costs connection with the Grochocinski deposition, as well as $24,984.90 in attorneys' fees to brief the motion for sanctions, for a total of $37,135.82. [ For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (hp, )
October 6, 2011 Filing 254 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal 218 (USCA no. 11-1393) consisting of One Electronic volume of of proceedings. (hp, )
October 5, 2011 Filing 253 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to supplement record on appeal pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(e) and Circuit Court Rule 10(b) 251 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/11/2011 on this motion is stricken. Mailed notice (tsa, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 252 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion to supplement 251 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/11/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
October 3, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to supplement record on appeal pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(e) and Circuit Court Rule 10(b) (Joyce, Edward)
July 22, 2011 Filing 250 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Grochocinski Joyce's Response to Defendants' Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 249 (Joyce, Edward)
July 8, 2011 Filing 249 PETITION by Defendants for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ciszewski, Steven)
July 7, 2011 Filing 248 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Per telephonic request, MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Plaintiff David Grochocinski to stay sanctions motion as it relates to Grochocinski only 244 is withdrawn. Motion hearing set for 7/11/2011 is stricken.Telephone notice (tsa, )
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/30/2011.(tsa, )
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, and pursuant to both § 1927 and its inherent power to enter sanctions, the Court denies the Mayer Browns motion for sanctions as to Grochocinski, and grants in part Mayer Browns motion as to Joyce. By July 8, 2011, Mayer Brown must file its fee petition detailing: (1) one-half the attorneys fees and costs it incurred in preparing for and taking Grochocinskis deposition; (2) one-half of the Grochocinski deposition costs; and (3) one-half the attorneys fees and costs it incurred to bring the sanctions motion. Any response to the bill of costs is due July 22, 2011. Mailed notice (tsa, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion to stay 244 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/11/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
June 30, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Plaintiff David Grochocinski to stay sanctions motion as it relates to Grochocinski only (Ciszewski, Steven)
June 15, 2011 Filing 243 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 06/15/2011 from the Seventh regarding notice of appeal 175 , notice of appeal 218 ; Appellate case no. : 10-2057 & 11-1393. Upon consideration of the MOTION TO INCLUDE SPEHAR OR TERMINATE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS, filed on June 13, 2011, by pro se party R. Gerard Spehar, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. (hp, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 242 REPLY by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP to memorandum in support of motion 177 , motion for sanctions 176 Against David Grochocinski, Bankruptcy Trustee for CMGT, Inc. (Novack, Stephen)
April 18, 2011 Filing 241 REPLY by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP to memorandum in support of motion 177 , motion for sanctions 176 Against Edward T. Joyce & Associates, P.C. (Novack, Stephen)
March 22, 2011 Filing 240 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for extension of time to file reply in support of motion for sanctions 176 , 238 is granted. Reply due by 4/18/2011. The motion will not be heard on 3/24/2011 as noticed.Mailed notice (tlp, )
March 18, 2011 Filing 239 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 238 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/24/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
March 18, 2011 Filing 238 MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for extension of time to file response/reply in support of motion for sanctions (Novack, Stephen)
March 14, 2011 Filing 237 NOTICE by David Grochocinski re response in opposition to motion 236 (Morgans, David)
March 14, 2011 Filing 236 RESPONSE by David Grochocinskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for sanctions 176 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Morgans, David)
March 14, 2011 Filing 235 RESPONSE by David Grochocinskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for sanctions 176 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-H)(Joyce, Edward)
March 10, 2011 Filing 234 USCA RECEIVED on 3/10/2011 the original record record regarding notice of appeal 218 . (hp, )
March 10, 2011 Filing 233 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file 35 Page Response Brief to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 230 is granted.Mailed notice (tsa, )
March 10, 2011 Filing 232 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 218 (USCA no. 11-1393). (gel, )
March 9, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion for leave to file 230 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/15/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
March 9, 2011 Filing 230 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file 35 Page Response Brief to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions (Joyce, Edward)
March 1, 2011 Filing 229 DESIGNATION by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 11-1393 (Novack, Stephen)
February 25, 2011 Filing 228 DESIGNATION by Movant Gerard Spehar of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 11-1393 (Exhibit). (hp, )
February 23, 2011 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/13/2007 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion Hearing. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2011. (Metzler, April)
February 23, 2011 Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/30/2007 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status Conference. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2011. (Metzler, April)
February 23, 2011 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/26/2007 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Oral Argument. Court Reporter Contact Information: APRIL METZLER, 312-408-5154, April_Metzler@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 3/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2011. (Metzler, April)
February 17, 2011 Filing 224 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice to plaintiff (hp, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 223 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 218 ; USCA Case No. 11-1393. (hp, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 221 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Respondent Grochocinski's motion for extension of time to respond to defendants' motion for sanctions 216 is granted. Response by 3/14/2011. Reply by 3/28/2011. Ruling will be made by mail. The motion for sanctions 176 is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (tsa, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 220 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 218 . Notified counsel (gel, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gel, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 218 NOTICE of appeal by Gerard Spehar regarding orders 214 , 213 . (Fee Due) (gel, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Morgans for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 216 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/22/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Morgans, David)
February 16, 2011 Filing 216 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for extension of time to file response/reply (Morgans, David)
February 14, 2011 Filing 215 WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/14/2011: The Court denies Grochocinskis Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Grochocinski shall respond to the Defendants Motion for Sanctions by February 28, 2011, and the Defendants shall reply by March 7, 2011. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/14/2011. Mailed notice(tsa, )
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/3/2011.(tsa, )
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter MEMORANDUM, OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Court denies Spehars Motion to Intervene and Dismisses his Motion to Alter or Amend as moot. Mailed notice (tsa, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 212 LETTER to Judge Kendall from Pro Se Movant R. Gerard Spehar dated 8/20/2010. (hp, )
August 18, 2010 Filing 211 LETTER to Judge Kendall by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP dated 8/18/2010 (Novack, Stephen) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/19/2010). (hp, ).
August 13, 2010 Filing 210 LETTER from R. Gerard Spehar dated 8/13/2010. (vmj, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 209 AFFIDAVIT of Ronald Holman to Supplement Previously filed Limited Ratification (Exhibit). (hp, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 207 Letter by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP (Novack, Stephen)
June 25, 2010 Filing 208 LETTER to Judge Kendall dated 6/24/2010 from pro se movant R. Gerard Spehar (Exhibits) re 173 , 193 . (hp, )
June 14, 2010 Filing 206 LETTER to Judge Kendall dated 6/14/2010 by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appellate Docket & Order Granting Stay)(Novack, Stephen) (Text Edited by Clerks Office on 6/15/2010) (hp, ).
June 10, 2010 Filing 205 REPLY by Movant Gerard Spehar in support of his motion to intervene 173 (Exhibits). (hp, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 204 SUPPLEMENT to Spehar motion to alter or amend by Gerry Spehar (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File) (vmj, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 203 NOTICE of filing by David Grochocinski re 202 (Morgans, David) Modified on 6/11/2010 (vmj, ).
June 10, 2010 Filing 202 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss defendants' motion for sanctions by David Grochocinski 193 (Morgans, David) Modified on 6/11/2010 (vmj, ).
June 3, 2010 Filing 201 RESPONSE by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLPin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 193 (Novack, Stephen)
May 27, 2010 Filing 200 RESPONSE by Defendants in Opposition to R. Gerard Spehar Motion to intervene 173 (hp, )
May 20, 2010 Filing 199 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 193 is taken under advisement. Responses are to be filed by 6/3/2010. Replies are to be filed by 6/10/2010. Court will by mail. Briefing on the motion for sanctions is stayed pending disposition of plaintiff's motion to dismiss.Advised in open court (jms, )
May 18, 2010 Filing 198 USCA RECEIVED on 5/18/2010 the long record regarding notice of appeal 175 . (gej, )
May 18, 2010 Filing 197 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 175 (USCA no. 10-2057). (gej, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 196 NOTICE by David Grochocinski OF FILING (Morgans, David)
May 17, 2010 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DAVID GROCHOCINSKI'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Morgans, David)
May 17, 2010 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Morgans for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 193 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/20/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Morgans, David)
May 17, 2010 Filing 193 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Morgans, David)
May 13, 2010 Filing 192 COPY of order dated 5/13/2010 from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit regarding notice of appeal 175 ; Appellate case no. : 10-2057. Upon consideration of the Appellant's Motion to stay appeal, filed on May 10, 2010, by counsel for the appellant,IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Proceedings in this appeal shall be held in abeyance pending resolution by the district court of the pending motion to intervene. Appellant is ORDERED to file a status report with this court by July 9, 2010 or within 10 days of the district courts resolution of the motion to intervene. (hp, )
May 13, 2010 Filing 189 DESIGNATION by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 10-2057 (Novack, Stephen)
May 12, 2010 Filing 191 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet, for Magistrate Denlow by David Grochocinski (hp, ) (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) Modified on 6/16/2010 (hp, ).
May 12, 2010 Filing 190 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by David Grochocinski (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) (hp, ) Modified on 6/16/2010 (hp, ).
May 12, 2010 Filing 188 REQUEST by Plaintiff to Clerk of the District Court for Inclusion of Certain Briefs and Memoranda in Record on Appeal Pursuant to Circuit Ruile 10(a) by David Grochocinski (Joyce, Edward) (Test Modified on by the Clerk's Office 5/13/2010). (hp, ).
May 7, 2010 Filing 187 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion hearing held. Motion of attorney David E. Morgans for leave to file his appearance on behalf of plaintiff 182 is granted. Briefing as to motion by movant Gerard Spehar to intervene 173 is set as follows: Response due by 5/27/2010; reply due by 6/10/2010. Briefing as to motion by defendants Ronald B. Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for sanctions 176 is set as follows: Response due by 6/3/2010; reply due by 6/24/2010. Leave is granted to file response and reply briefs in excess of that page limit, up to 20 pages. Rulings by mail. Motion by movant Gerard Spehar to alter judgment [174} is entered and continued until the Court determines whether he will be allowed to intervene. Mailed (vmj, )
May 7, 2010 Filing 186 NOTICE by David Grochocinski OF FILING re 185 (Morgans, David) Modified on 5/10/2010 (vmj, ).
May 7, 2010 Filing 185 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Grochocinski by David Edward Morgans (Morgans, David)
May 4, 2010 Filing 184 LIMITED RATIFICATION of Ronald Holman. (hp, )
May 4, 2010 Filing 183 NOTICE of Motion by David Edward Morgans for presentment of motion for leave to file 182 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/10/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Morgans, David)
May 4, 2010 Filing 182 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file Appearance (Attachments: # 1 Appearance)(Morgans, David)
April 30, 2010 Filing 181 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 175 ; USCA Case No. 10-2057 (hp, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 180 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 175 . Notified counsel (gej, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (gej, )
April 29, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for sanctions 176 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/6/2010 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM by Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP in support of motion for sanctions 176 (Novack, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Filing 176 MOTION by Defendants Ronald B Given, Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP for sanctions (Novack, Stephen)
April 29, 2010 Filing 175 NOTICE of appeal by David Grochocinski regarding orders 171 , 172 Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-4767406. (Joyce, Edward)
April 28, 2010 Filing 174 MOTION by Movant Gerard Spehar to alter judgment or amend by Movant Gerard Spehar (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Exhibits 1 thru E, # 2 Attachment 2 - Affidavit F thru Decl. B, # 3 Attachment 3 - Decl. C thru Exhibit 2 Motion, # 4 Attachment 4 - Exhibit 3 Motion thru 4 Motion, # 5 Attachment 5 - Exhibit 4 Motion - Part 2, # 6 Atttachment 6 - Exhibit J & OL) (Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File). (hp, )
April 28, 2010 Filing 173 MOTION by Movant Gerard Spehar to Intervene (hp, )
March 31, 2010 Filing 172 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 3/31/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/31/2010:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE entry before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Pursuant to Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this day, defendants' motion for summary judgment 135 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 169 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:The Court has sufficient briefing from the parties on the motion and no further briefing is permitted. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a sur-reply 166 is denied. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 168 RESPONSE by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Givenin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file Sur-Reply to Defendants' Three New Arguments or, Alternatively, to Open Merits Discovery for a Limited Purpose 166 (Novack, Stephen)
August 25, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion for leave to file 166 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/3/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
August 25, 2009 Filing 166 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file Sur-Reply to Defendants' Three New Arguments or, Alternatively, to Open Merits Discovery for a Limited Purpose (Joyce, Edward)
August 19, 2009 Filing 165 RULE 56 56.1(a) Statement by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given regarding motion for summary judgment 135 Reply to Plaintiff's Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement in Support of His Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Novack, Stephen)
August 19, 2009 Filing 164 REPLY by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for summary judgment On Their Unclean Hands Defenses 135 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Novack, Stephen)
August 5, 2009 Filing 163 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendants' motion for leave to file a 25 page reply brief 161 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 161 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/11/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
August 4, 2009 Filing 161 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for leave to file excess pages (second) (Novack, Stephen)
July 20, 2009 Filing 160 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendants' unopposed motions for an extension of time to 8/19/2009 to file a reply to their motion for summary judgment and for leave to file a brief in excess of 15 pages are granted. The reply brief is limited to 20 pages.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 17, 2009 Filing 159 RESPONSE by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to Defendants Amended Unoposed Motion for Extension of Time (Joyce, Edward)
July 17, 2009 Filing 158 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply,, motion for relief,,, 157 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/3/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
July 17, 2009 Filing 157 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion 150 , motion for summary judgment 135 and for Leave to File Oversize Reply -- Amended (Novack, Stephen)
July 17, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time to file response/reply as to response in opposition to motion 150 , motion for summary judgment 135 and for Leave to file Oversize Reply (Novack, Stephen)
July 13, 2009 Filing 155 APPENDIX response in opposition to motion 150 Volume 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 88-93, # 2 Exhibit 94, # 3 Exhibit 95-98, # 4 Exhibit 99-102, # 5 Exhibit 103-109)(Joyce, Edward)
July 13, 2009 Filing 154 APPENDIX response in opposition to motion 150 Volume 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 51-63, # 2 Exhibit 64-66, # 3 Exhibit 67-78, # 4 Exhibit 79-84, # 5 Exhibit 85-87)(Joyce, Edward)
July 13, 2009 Filing 153 APPENDIX response in opposition to motion 150 Volume 1 of 3 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-32, # 4 Exhibit 33-50)(Joyce, Edward)
July 13, 2009 Filing 152 RULE 56 (b)(3)(C) Statement in Support of His Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Joyce, Edward)
July 13, 2009 Filing 151 RULE 56 1(b)(3)(A)-(B) Statement Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Local Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Their Unclean Hands Defenses (Joyce, Edward)
July 13, 2009 Filing 150 RESPONSE by David Grochocinskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for summary judgment On Their Unclean Hands Defenses 135 (Joyce, Edward)
July 6, 2009 Filing 149 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:Motion to compel 139 is withdrawn by agreement of the parties. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge. Case no longer referred to Honorable Morton Denlow. Status hearing set for 7/28/09 is stricken.Mailed notice (dmk, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:This matter has been referred to Judge Denlow for ruling on a pending motion. If no briefing schedule has been set or if no briefing is desired, the parties are to notice the motion up on Mondays or Wednesdays at 9:15 a.m. Judge Denlow does not desire briefs on discovery disputes. Otherwise, the parties are to appear for status or argument at 10:00 a.m. on 7/28/2009.Mailed notice (dmk, )
June 24, 2009 Filing 147 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Morton Denlow. (See order for detail). Signed by Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/23/2009.(hp, )
June 24, 2009 Filing 146 RESPONSE by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to compel Production of Documents 139 (Novack, Stephen)
June 23, 2009 Filing 145 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion for extension of time 141 to file response regarding motion by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for summary judgment 135 is granted. Response due by 7/13/2009. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file brief in excess pages 143 is granted.Mailed notice (tlp, )
June 19, 2009 Filing 144 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 143 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/25/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
June 19, 2009 Filing 143 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file excess pages in Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Local Rule 56.1(b)(3)(C) (Joyce, Edward)
June 19, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 141 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/25/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
June 19, 2009 Filing 141 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for extension of time to file response/reply Response to Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Joyce, Edward)
June 19, 2009 Filing 140 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion to compel 139 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/25/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
June 19, 2009 Filing 139 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to compel Production of Documents (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Joyce, Edward)
May 29, 2009 Filing 138 APPENDIX Rule 56 statement 137 to Local Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Their Unclean Hands Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits B-F, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits G-I, # 4 Exhibit J Part 1, # 5 Exhibit J Part 2, # 6 Exhibit J Part 3, # 7 Exhibit J Part 4, # 8 Exhibit J Part 5, # 9 Exhibit J Part 6, # 10 Exhibit J Part 7, # 11 Exhibit J Part 8, # 12 Exhibit J Part 9, # 13 Exhibit J Part 10, # 14 Exhibit J Part 11, # 15 Exhibit J Part 12, # 16 Exhibit J Part 13, # 17 Exhibit J Part 14, # 18 Exhibit J Part 15, # 19 Exhibit J Part 16, # 20 Exhibit J Part 17, # 21 Exhibit K Part 1, # 22 Exhibit K Part 2, # 23 Exhibit K Part 3, # 24 Exhibit K Part 4, # 25 Exhibit K Part 5)(Novack, Stephen)
May 29, 2009 Filing 137 RULE 56.1(a) Statement by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given regarding motion for summary judgment 135 On Their Unclean Hands Defenses (Novack, Stephen)
May 29, 2009 Filing 136 MEMORANDUM by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given in support of motion for summary judgment 135 On Their Unclean Hands Defenses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Proceedings)(Novack, Stephen)
May 29, 2009 Filing 135 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for summary judgment On Their Unclean Hands Defenses (Novack, Stephen)
May 12, 2009 Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendants' unopposed motion for leave to file its summary judgment brief in excess of 15 pages and limited to 30 pages and for leave to file a Rule 56.1 statement with 150 paragraphs 132 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
May 8, 2009 Filing 133 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 132 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/14/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
May 8, 2009 Filing 132 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for leave to file excess pages (Novack, Stephen)
March 31, 2009 Filing 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Status hearing held on 3/31/2009. Defendants oral motion for an extension of fact discovery cut-off date is granted. Fact discovery ordered closed by 5/1/2009. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 6/1/2009; Response due by 6/29/2009; Reply due by 7/20/2009.Mailed notice (tlp, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 130 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Supplemental Objections to Judge Denlows alternative ruling [#127]is granted.. Discovery remains open until March 31, 2009. Mailed notice (jms, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 129 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Having been entered in error, this courts order dated January 30, 2009 [ doc # 124] is vacated. This Court therefore adopts Judge Denlows alternative ruling. Mailed notice (jms, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 128 NOTICE of Motion by Edward T. Joyce for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief 127 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/23/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Joyce, Edward)
February 17, 2009 Filing 127 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to strike MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B GivenObjection to Alternative Ruling 126 Supplemental Objection (Joyce, Edward)
February 13, 2009 Filing 126 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B GivenObjection to Alternative Ruling (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit C contd., # 3 Exhibit D-G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I)(Novack, Stephen)
February 2, 2009 Filing 125 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Sua sponte, status hearing date of 2/12/2009 is reset for 3/31/2009 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 30, 2009 Filing 124 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: This Court intends to adopt Judge Denlows alternative ruling. Defendants are given two weeks from the date of this order to file objections to the alternative ruling. In addition, Defendants Unopposed Motion to Reset the Discovery Deadline is granted so that discovery may be completed pending the resolution of these privilege issues. Discovery is ordered closed March 31, 2009.Mailed notice (jms, )
January 22, 2009 Filing 123 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Sua sponte, status hearing date of 2/3/2009 is reset for 2/12/2009 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Defendants' objection to the alternative ruling in Magistrate Judge Denlow's 6/9/2008 memorandum opinion and order is taken under advisement. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 12, 2008 Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 120 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/18/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
November 12, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B GivenObjection to Alternative Ruling in Magistrate Denlow's June 9, 2008 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Novack, Stephen)
October 28, 2008 Filing 119 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Defendants are given to 11/12/2008 to file objections to the alternative ruling. In addition, Defendants unopposed motion to reset the discovery deadline is granted so that discovery may be completed pending the resolution of these privilege issues. Discovery is ordered closed January 31, 2009. Status hearing date of 11/4/2008 is reset for 2/3/2009 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
October 22, 2008 Filing 118 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 117 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/28/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
October 22, 2008 Filing 117 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time to complete discovery regarding the "Defenses" (Ciszewski, Steven)
July 30, 2008 Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's objection to defendant's previously unopposed motion for extension of time and defendant's response are taken under advisement. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 115 RESPONSE by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B. Given to plaintiff's objection to defendants' previously unoppoed motion for extension of time 113 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Ciszewski, Steven) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/29/2008) (hp, ).
July 24, 2008 Filing 114 Notice of Objection NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/31/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
July 24, 2008 Filing 113 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Previously Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by David Grochocinski (Carroll, Robert)
July 18, 2008 Filing 112 RESPONSE by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to other, 104 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Novack, Stephen)
July 14, 2008 Filing 111 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendants' unopposed motion to reset discovery deadline 109 is granted. Discovery regarding the defenses shall be completed by 10/31/2008. Status hearing date of 8/5/2008 is reset for 11/4/2008 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jms, )
July 11, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion to reset 109 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/17/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
July 11, 2008 Filing 109 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to reset Discovery Deadline regarding the Defenses (Ciszewski, Steven)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's motion for an extension of time to file objections to the magistrate judge's alternative ruling in the memorandum opinion and order dated 6/9/2008 is taken under advisement. Court will rule on the motion when it rules on the objections to the magistrate judge's memorandum opinion and order dated 6/9/2008.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Defendant's telephonic request for an extension of time to 7/18/2008 to file a response to plaintiff's objections to the magistrate's memorandum opinion and order dated 6/9/2008 is granted. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Plaintiff's objections to the magistrate judge's memorandum opinion and order dated 6/9/2008 are taken under advisement. Any responses are to be filed by 7/11/2008. No reply is necessary. Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 23, 2008 Filing 105 Notice of Objection NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/26/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
June 23, 2008 Filing 104 Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Denlow's Memorandum Opinion and Order Dated June 9, 2008 by David Grochocinski (Attachments: # 1 Errata Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Carroll, Robert)
June 23, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of extension of time 102 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/26/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
June 23, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time (Ciszewski, Steven)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 6/9/2008:Mailed notice(dmk, )
June 9, 2008 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:Plaintiff's Motion for protective order 72 is granted in part and denied in part. Enter Memorandum Opinions and Order. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, the case is returned to the assigned judge.Case no longer referred to Honorable Morton Denlow.; Motions terminated: ; JMailed notice (dmk, )
June 4, 2008 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Morton Denlow:On the Court's request, the ruling regarding privilege log is due on or by 6/11/08. Ruling date of 6/4/08 is stricken.Mailed notice (dmk, )
May 20, 2008 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM Response 94 by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given Supplemental Memorandum Regarding 2005 Dexia Credit Opinion (Novack, Stephen)
May 19, 2008 Filing 97 Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Dexia Credit Local v. Rogan by David Grochocinski (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Carroll, Robert)
May 14, 2008 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Morton Denlow:Oral argument held on 5/14/2008 regarding privilege log. Motion taken under advisement. Ruling by mail on or by 6/4/08.Mailed notice (dmk, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 95 REPLY by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to other, 90 in Support of His Memorandum in Support of His Privilege Log Assertions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Carroll, Robert)
March 26, 2008 Filing 94 RESPONSE by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to other, 90 Plaintiff's privilege log assertions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-F)(Novack, Stephen)
March 25, 2008 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Morton Denlow:Unopposed Motion for leave to file 26-page brief and reset oral argument date 91 is granted. Oral argument reset to 5/14/08 at 10:00 AM. regarding privilege log. Oral argument set for 4/23/08 is stricken. Motion hearing set for 3/26/08 is stricken. Motions terminated: Mailed notice (dmk, )
March 24, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 91 before Honorable Morton Denlow on 3/26/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
March 24, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for leave to file excess pages and to reset oral argument date (Ciszewski, Steven)
February 20, 2008 Filing 90 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Privilege Log Assertions by David Grochocinski (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10)(Carroll, Robert)
February 19, 2008 Filing 89 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : The Unopposed Motion for extension of time to complete discovery 87 is granted. Discovery regarding the Defenses shall be completed by 7/31/2008. The status hearing previously set for 3/26/08 is stricken and reset for 8/5/2008 at 09:00 AM. The 2/26/08 presentment date for said motion is stricken; no appearance is required. Mailed notice. (kw, )
February 18, 2008 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 87 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/26/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
February 18, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time to complete discovery regarding "unclean hands," "unjust result" or "fraud on the court" defenses (Ciszewski, Steven)
February 14, 2008 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before Judge Morton Denlow :Motion for leave to file excess pages 84 is granted. Motion hearing set for 2/20/08 is stricken. Motions terminated: Mailed notice (dmk, )
February 13, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 84 before Honorable Morton Denlow on 2/20/2008 at 09:15 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
February 13, 2008 Filing 84 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file excess pages of 15 of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of His Privilege Log Assertions (Carroll, Robert)
January 17, 2008 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before Judge Morton Denlow :Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 1/17/2008. Plaintiff's brief concerning privilege log due by 2/20/08. Defendants brief due by 3/26/08. Plaintiff's reply due 4/9/08. Oral argument set for 4/23/2008 at 10:00 AM. regarding privilege log.Mailed notice (dmk, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 82 STATUS Report by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(Marinello, Mitchell)
January 9, 2008 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : On the Court's own motion, the Status hearing currently set for 3/19 is stricken and reset to Wednesday, 3/26/2008 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (kw, )
December 18, 2007 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before Judge Morton Denlow :Status hearing reset to 1/17/2008 at 10:00 AM. on request of the parties in Courtroom 1350. Parties shall deliver a copy of an initial status report to chambers, Room 1356, five business days before the initial status hearing. If the parties have recently prepared and filed an initial status report, the submission of the previously filed initial status report is sufficient. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Denlow's standing order setting initial status report. Copies are available in chambers or through Judge Denlow's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 1/15/08 is stircken.Mailed notice (dmk, )
December 17, 2007 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before Judge Morton Denlow :This case has been referred to Judge Denlow to conduct a settlement conference. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Denlow's Standing Order Setting Settlement Conference. Copies are available in chambers or through Judge Denlow's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Denlow requires full compliance with this standing order before conducting a settlement conference. Failure to comply with the provisions of the Court's Standing Order Setting Settlement Conference may result in the unilateral cancellation of the settlement conference by the Court. The parties shall jointly contact the courtroom deputy, Donna Kuempel at 312/435-5857, with mutually agreeable dates or appear at 10:00 a.m. on 1/15/08 to set a settlement conference date. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Denlow, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, no continuance will be granted without a motion showing extreme hardship. Parties are required to deliver to chambers or fax to chambers (312/554-8547) copies of their most recent settlement demands and offers at least three (3) business days prior to the settlement conference.Mailed notice (dmk, )
December 17, 2007 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : To clarify minute entry # 76 from the hearing regarding Plaintiff's motion for a protective order, the expedited referral to Magistrate Judge Denlow for all discovery 77 includes a referral to Magistrate Judge Denlow for determination of Plaintiff's Motion for a protective order 72 . Mailed notice. (kw, )
December 13, 2007 Filing 77 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Morton Denlow for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision.(kw, )Mailed notice.
December 13, 2007 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : Hearing held re motion for a protective order 72 . Deadline to complete discovery is extended to 03/3/08. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Denlow for issues relating to discovery on this motion. Parties are to produce a privilege log to Judge Denlow no later than 3/10/08. Case set for Further Status hearing before Judge Kendall on 3/19/2008 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (kw, )
December 12, 2007 Filing 75 REPLY by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to motion for protective order 72 in Support of (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Robert)
December 11, 2007 Filing 74 RESPONSE by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Givenin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for protective order 72 (Novack, Stephen)
December 7, 2007 Filing 73 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion for protective order 72 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/13/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
December 7, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Robert)
December 3, 2007 Filing 71 RESPONSE by Defendant Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP to Plaintiff's Request to Admit (Marinello, Mitchell)
December 3, 2007 Filing 70 RESPONSE by Defendant Ronald B Given to Plaintiff's Request to Admit (Marinello, Mitchell)
November 6, 2007 Filing 69 Plaintiff's Request to Admit to Defendant Ronald B. Given by David Grochocinski (Carroll, Robert)
November 6, 2007 Filing 68 Plaintiff's Request to Admit to Defendant Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP by David Grochocinski (Carroll, Robert)
October 30, 2007 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record in open court, motion for reconsideration 50 is denied. Discovery regarding "unclean hands" ordered closed by 1/28/2008. Any motion for summary judgment shall be filed by 2/28/2008. Responses due by 3/28/2008. Replies due by 4/11/2008. Mailed notice (gmr, )
October 25, 2007 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing set for 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (gmr, )
October 16, 2007 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing held on 10/16/2007. Mailed notice (gmr, )
October 9, 2007 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing set for 10/16/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (gmr, )
September 26, 2007 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Oral argument held on 9/26/2007. Motion for reconsideration 50 is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (gmr, )
September 21, 2007 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Plaintiff's motion for leave to cite additional previously unavailable authority during oral argument 60 is granted. Mailed notice (gmr, )
September 18, 2007 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion for leave to file 60 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/26/2007 at 10:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
September 18, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file Cite Additional Authority, Previously Unavailable Authority During Oral Argument (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Robert)
September 6, 2007 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :By agreement of counsel, Oral Argument set for 9/13/2007 is stricken and reset to 9/26/2007 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (gmr, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion to strike 55 is denied. The presentment date of 9/6/2007 for said motion is hereby stricken. Oral argument set for 9/13/2007 at 10:00 AM. Said hearing is set for 30 minutes (15 minutes per side). Mailed notice (gmr, )
September 5, 2007 Filing 57 RESPONSE by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Givenin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to strike Portions of Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Reconsider 55 (Novack, Stephen)
August 30, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion to strike 55 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/6/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
August 30, 2007 Filing 55 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski to strike Portions of Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Reconsider (Carroll, Robert)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to response in opposition to motion, 53 , MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, text entry 48 , memorandum opinion and order 49 and/or for other relief 50 (Novack, Stephen)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE by David Grochocinskiin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, text entry 48 , memorandum opinion and order 49 and/or for other relief 50 (Carroll, Robert)
July 19, 2007 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held. Briefing schedule regarding motion for reconsideration and motion for relief 50 set as follows: Responses due by 8/9/2007. Replies due by 8/23/2007. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (gmr, )
July 13, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion for reconsideration, motion for relief,, 50 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/19/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
July 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for reconsideration regarding order on motion to dismiss, text entry 48 , memorandum opinion and order 49 and/or for other relief (Novack, Stephen)
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Virginia M. Kendall on 6/28/2007:Mailed notice(gmr, )
June 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :For the reasons set out in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Lawyer Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 15 is granted in part and denied in part.Mailed notice (gmr, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing held and continued to 12/31/2007 at 09:00 AM. Fact Discovery ordered closed by 12/21/2007. Expert Discovery ordered closed by 2/7/2008. Any dispositive motions shall be filed by 3/7/2008. Responses due by 4/7/2008. Replies due by 4/21/2008. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (gmr, )
June 13, 2007 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :At the Court's direction, status hearing set for 6/18/2007 is stricken and reset to 6/25/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
June 12, 2007 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : Pursuant to the Notice of Rule 41(a)(1)(I) Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, Defendant Charles W.Trautner is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (hp, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Grochocinski (Carroll, Robert)
May 11, 2007 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :At the Court's direction, status hearing set for 6/11/2007 is stricken and reset to 6/18/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
April 18, 2007 Filing 42 Lawyer Defendants' Position Statement Regarding Possible Referral to Bankruptcy Judge STATEMENT by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Novack, Stephen)
April 18, 2007 Filing 41 Plaintiff's Position Paper Regarding Referral to the Bankruptcy Court by David Grochocinski (Carroll, Robert)
April 17, 2007 Filing 40 ALIAS Summons one Original and one copy on Issued as to Charles W. Trautner. (hp, )
April 17, 2007 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held. Motion for extension of time to Serve Defendant Charles W. Trautner 37 is granted to and including 6/8/2007. Final Extension. Status hearing set for 5/16/2007 is stricken and reset to 6/11/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
April 9, 2007 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of extension of time 37 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/17/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
April 9, 2007 Filing 37 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for extension of time (Second) to Serve Defendant Charles W. Trautner (Carroll, Robert)
March 28, 2007 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Status hearing held and continued to 5/16/2007 at 09:00 AM. Counsel shall file position papers as discussed on the record by 4/18/2007.Mailed notice (gmr, )
March 14, 2007 Filing 35 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Charles W Trautner. (td, )
March 7, 2007 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :At the Court's direction, status hearing set for 3/14/2007 is stricken and reset to 3/28/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
February 8, 2007 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held. Motion for extension of time to serve Defendant Charles W. Trautner 30 is granted to and including 4/9/2007.Mailed notice (gmr, )
February 7, 2007 Filing 32 REPLY by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to dismiss 15 (Novack, Stephen)
February 2, 2007 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of extension of time 30 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/8/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
February 2, 2007 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for extension of time to Serve Defendant Charles W. Trautner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Carroll, Robert)
January 19, 2007 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion for extension of time to file reply brief 27 is granted to and including 2/7/2007. Motion for leave to file excess pages 27 is granted to 26 pages. Status hearing set for 2/22/2007 is stricken and reset to 3/14/2007 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
January 16, 2007 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Steven J. Ciszewski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file, motion for leave to file excess pages,, 27 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/22/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Ciszewski, Steven)
January 16, 2007 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for extension of time to file Reply Brief, MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for leave to file excess pages with Reply Brief (Ciszewski, Steven)
January 10, 2007 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion for leave to file excess pages 23 is granted to 26 pages. The presentment date of 1/11/2007 for said motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (gmr, )
January 5, 2007 Filing 25 RESPONSE by David Grochocinski to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to dismiss 15 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Carroll, Robert)
January 5, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 23 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/11/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
January 5, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for leave to file excess pages (Carroll, Robert)
January 5, 2007 Filing 22 RESPONSE by David Grochocinski to MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to dismiss 15 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Carroll, Robert)
December 19, 2006 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion for extension of time to file response/reply regarding MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to dismiss 15 19 is granted as follows: Responses due by 1/5/2007. Replies due by 1/24/2007. The Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 1/30/2007 is stricken and reset to 2/22/2007 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
December 15, 2006 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Robert D Carroll for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 19 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/21/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Carroll, Robert)
December 15, 2006 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff David Grochocinski for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Carroll, Robert)
December 4, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings Status hearing set for 1/30/2007 at 09:00 AM. (gmr, )
December 4, 2006 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : Briefing schedule as to motion to dismiss 15 set as follows: Responses due by 12/19/2006. Replies due by 12/29/2006. The Court will rule by mail. The presentment date of 12/5/2006 for said motion is hereby stricken. Status hearing set for 1/30/2007 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (gmr, )
November 30, 2006 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Stephen Novack for presentment of motion to dismiss 15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 12/5/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Novack, Stephen)
November 30, 2006 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given in Support of motion to dismiss 15 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B# 2 Exhibit C-E)(Novack, Stephen)
November 30, 2006 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given to dismiss (Novack, Stephen)
November 30, 2006 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given by Stephen Novack (Novack, Stephen)
November 27, 2006 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall : Unopposed motion for leave to file twenty-page brief 10 is granted. The presentment date of 11/28/2006 for said motion is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (gmr, )
November 21, 2006 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Mitchell L. Marinello for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/28/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Marinello, Mitchell)
November 21, 2006 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Mitchell L. Marinello for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 10 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/28/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Marinello, Mitchell)
November 21, 2006 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP, Ronald B Given for leave to file excess pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Twenty-Page Brief (Marinello, Mitchell)
October 20, 2006 Filing 9 2 SUMMONS and 2 copies Issued as to Defendants Ronald B Given, Charles W Trautner (vmj, )
October 17, 2006 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Grochocinski by Edward T. Joyce (Joyce, Edward)
October 17, 2006 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Grochocinski by Arthur W. Aufmann (Aufmann, Arthur)
October 17, 2006 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Grochocinski by Robert D Carroll (Carroll, Robert)
October 12, 2006 MAILED Letter regarding notice of removal with an attorney appearance form to Edward T. Joyce, plaintiff's counsel. (vmj, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP by Steven J. Ciszewski (vmj, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP by Mitchell L. Marinello (vmj, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (vmj, )
October 10, 2006 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, County Department, Law Division, case number (2006 L 8944) filed by Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP with copies of summons and complaint. (vmj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grochocinski v. Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Grochocinski
Represented By: Edward T. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayer Brown Rowe & Maw LLP
Represented By: Stephen Novack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B Given
Represented By: Stephen Novack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?