Championsworld L.L.C. v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc. et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv05724
Filed: October 20, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2012 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/17/2012:Mailed notice(wp, )
August 17, 2011 316 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/17/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )
July 21, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/21/2010:Mailed notice(wp, )
November 7, 2008 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/7/2008:Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Championsworld L.L.C. v. United States Soccer Federation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?