Driver et al v. Appleillinois, LLC

Case Number: 1:2006cv06149
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2013 439 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 10/29/2013.(psm, )
January 8, 2013 387 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 1/8/2013.(psm, )
September 19, 2012 366 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 9/19/2012.(psm, )
August 27, 2012 363 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 8/27/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, )
March 2, 2012 334 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 3/2/2012. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 9, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 9/9/2011: Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 21, 2010 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant AppleIllinois and Individual Defendants Smith, Borke, Brugh and Kreger 246 is granted in part and denied in part, and continued in part for in camera review of certain documents, as set out below. [For further details see text below.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 2, 2010 231 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 3/2/2010:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver et al v. Appleillinois, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?