Meyer Intellectual Properties Limited et al v. Bodum, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2006cv06329
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 355 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/28/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
April 7, 2014 323 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/7/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
March 9, 2011 239 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Bodum, Inc. for judgment As A Matter of Law (Renewed) (Rigg, Robert)
February 16, 2011 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/16/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 7, 2010 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/7/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 7, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/7/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 3, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/3/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 15, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/15/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 11, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/11/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer Intellectual Properties Limited et al v. Bodum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?