Nance et al v. City Of Elgin et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv06608
Filed: November 30, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2010 218 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/9/2010: The plaintiffs' motion for a new trial [205-1] is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice. (kj, )
September 29, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City Of Elgin for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) (Piskorski, Thomas)
September 22, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: The defendant's objection to the plaintiffs' introduction of police reports is overruled, subject to an offer of proof by the plaintiffs that city officials determined the number of incidents of disorderly conduct, fighting or other criminal activity under § 6.0145(g) of the Elgin municipal code based upon police reports. Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/22/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 2, 2010 159 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendant's motion for leave to depose James Kerwin [#156] is granted. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/2/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
July 12, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 7/12/2010: Defendant City of Elgin's objections 145-1] to the Magistrate Judge's June 21, 2010, order are overruled. The parties shall report for the status hearing previously scheduled for July 13, 2010, at 11:00 a.m., and shall be prepared to set a date for trial.Mailed notice(rth, )
November 2, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 11/2/2009:Mailed notice(rth, )
June 12, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants City Of Elgin, William Miller, Richard Kozal for judgment Against Third Party Witness Stevenson Jones (Piskorski, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance et al v. City Of Elgin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?