Hill v. City Of Chicago et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv06772
Filed: December 7, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 616 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/1/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 30, 2011 608 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/30/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 28, 2011 575 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/28/2011: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendant's omnibus motion in limine 478 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
July 6, 2011 568 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/6/2011: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 2 473 and grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 3 474 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
July 5, 2011 565 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/5/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 27, 2011 542 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/27/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 20, 2011 526 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/20/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 31, 2011 409 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/31/2011: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion to compel and modify the protective order 394 without prejudice. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
January 26, 2009 312 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/26/2009:Mailed notice(kef, )
December 15, 2008 302 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/15/2008:Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. City Of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?