Munch et al v. Sears Roebuck & Co.

Case Number: 1:2006cv07023
Filed: December 19, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2016 598 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 9/13/2016. Mailed notice. (dm, )
February 29, 2016 590 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 2/29/2016. Mailed notice(lxs, )
July 20, 2015 498 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 7/20/2015. Mailed notice (ber, )
July 7, 2010 197 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/7/2010: Sears's motion to strike new opinions from Dr. R. Gary Wilson's rebuttal report 188 is granted in part and denied in part. Paragraph 5 of Dr. Wilson's rebuttal report is stricken and plaintiffs may not rely on the opinions expressed in that paragraph in a motion, at a hearing, or at trial. Mailed notice(mad, )
November 4, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/4/2009:Mailed notice(mad, )
September 30, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/30/2008:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munch et al v. Sears Roebuck & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?