Carlson et al v. Bukovic et al

Plaintiff: June O Carlson and Paul G Carlson
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores Inc, City of Darien, Scott Bukovic, Wal-mart Associates Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East Inc and Wal-Mart Realty Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Nan R. Nolan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 271 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 3/18/2011.Mailed notice(lxs, )
August 26, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 8/26/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )
August 7, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 8/7/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )
June 17, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Scott Bukovic for judgment as a Matter of Law (Scarry, Laura)
June 4, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 6/4/2009: Mailed notice(hp, )
May 4, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 5/4/2009.Mailed notice(lxs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson et al v. Bukovic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores Inc
Represented By: James P. Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Darien
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Bukovic
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Realty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June O Carlson
Represented By: Arthur George Jaros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul G Carlson
Represented By: Arthur George Jaros, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?