Google Inc v. Central Mfg. Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. alleges that Defendants have falsely represented that they own a federal registration for the GOOGLE mark, that they are owners of common law rights in the GOOGLE mark and that they have the right to license the GOOGLE mark to third parties.

Plaintiff: Google Inc
Defendant: Central Mfg. Inc., Stealth Industries, Inc. and Central Mfg. Inc. and Stealth Industries, by and through Richard M. Fogel, not individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee
Movant: Leo Stoller
Trustee: Richard M. Fogel, not individually, but as chapter 7 trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Leo Stoller
Case Number: 1:2007cv00385
Filed: January 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 09-3569 consisting of four loose pleadings and four transcripts. (vcf, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MANDATE of USCA dated 12/17/2009 regarding notice of appeal 39 ; USCA No. 09-3569: It is Ordered that the motion is granted. The appeal is dismissed pursuant to the filing bar imposed on appellant by this court. In. Re: Leo Stoller, No. 08-4240 (7th Cir. 12/04/2009) (tlm)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Issuance of Mandate from U.S.C.A, No. 09-3569 dated 1/8/2010. (tlm)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on October 13, 2009 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, 312-435-5639, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2010. (Cox, Carolyn)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 USCA RECEIVED on 11/13/09 the long record regarding notice of appeal 137 (dj, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 137 (USCA no. 09-3569) (dj, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE by Leo Stoller of filing transcripts. (vcf, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Google Inc to other 139 Stoller's Purported "Notice of Granting In Forma Pauperis Petition" (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice. (vcf, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 137 ; USCA Case No. 09-3569. (vcf, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 137 . Notified counsel (dj, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record (dj, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of granting in forma pauperis petition by Leo Stoller. (dj, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DESIGNATION by Leo Stoller of content of record on appeal. (dj, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of appeal by Leo Stoller regarding orders 136 , 135 , 134 (ifp) (dj, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/16/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Enter Permanent Injunction and Final judgment. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jms, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Stollers motion for reconsideration 111 is denied.Mailed notice (jms, )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion hearing held regarding motion for judgment 123 . Court will issue an order shortly. Advised in opn court (jms, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE by Leo Stoller to MOTION Google Inc for judgment and entry of stipulated permanent injunction 123 ;Notice. (vcf, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion by Jonathan Cyrluk to file the appearance of Lance Johnson as appear pro hac vice 130 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000004155494. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 6/16/2009 from the USCA regarding notice of appeal 39 ; Appellate case no. : 07-1569, 07-1612 and 07-1651. The following is before the court: Notice of Sanction Payment, filed on June 3, 2008, by the pro se appellant. It is ordered that the court's order dated August 23,2007, imposing a filing bar in accordance with Mack, is Rescinded. Leo Stoller has paid the underlying sanction in full. The clerk of this court shall send a copy of this order to the clerks of all federal courts in this circuit. (vcf, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 POSITION brief by Leo Stoller (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5-7, # 2 Exhibit 7-8). ( Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.)(vcf, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 POSITION brief by Leo Stoller;Notice. # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 contd) (vcf, ). ( Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE of Service of permanent injunction by Jonathan M. Cyrluk on behalf of Google Inc (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion for judgment 123 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/13/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 DECLARATION of Michael T. Zeller regarding motion for judgment 123 and entry of stipulated permanent injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-17, # 3 Exhibit 18-26)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION by Plaintiff Google Inc for judgment and entry of stipulated permanent injunction (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECLARATION of Michael T. Zeller regarding memorandum 121 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-19)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 EXHIBIT F by Movant Leo Stoller regarding reply to Google's response to motion for reconsideration 116 , 114 .( Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.) (smm)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 EXHIBIT E by Movant Leo Stoller regarding reply to Google's response to motion for reconsideration 116 , 114 (Attachments: #(1) Continuation of Exhibit E).( Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File.)(smm)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 EXHIBIT D by Movant Leo Stoller regarding reply to Google's response to motion for reconsideration 116 , 114 . (smm)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 EXHIBIT C by Movant Leo Stoller regarding reply to Google's response to motion for reconsideration 116 , (Attachment(s): #(1) Continuation of Exhibit C) 114 . (smm) Modified on 9/16/2009 (smm).
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY by Leo Stoller to Google's response to motion for reconsideration 114 (Exhibits); Notice. (smm)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Google Inc in Opposition to MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for reconsideration regarding terminate motions, 109 111 Declaration of Michael T. Zeller In Support of Google's Response to Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Zeller, Michael)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for reconsideration regarding terminate motions, 109 111 Google Inc.'s Response to Motion for Reconsideration (Zeller, Michael)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Mr. Stoller's motion for reconsideration 111 is taken under advisement. Response is to be filed by 9/9/2009. Reply is to be filed by 9/16/2009. Mr. Stoller's motion for an extension of time to file his position brief pursuant to this court's order of 8/17/2009 111 is granted in part. The parties are given to 9/30/2009 to file their position briefs on the extent to which Stollers corporations are subject to suit and when this case arose and as such the propriety of the involvement of the bankruptcy estate. Mailed notice (jms, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion for reconsideration 111 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/27/2009 at 09:00 AM. (hp, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for reconsideration regarding its opinion dated August 17, 2009 109 (Exhibit) (hp, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/17/2009:Mailed notice(jms, )
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Stollers motion to Iniervene is denied. The parties are directed to submit position papers regarding the extent to which Stollers corporations are subject to suit and when this case arose and as such the propriety of the involvement of the bankruptcy estate. The parties must submit such position papers by 9/9/2009.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Movant Stollers motion to suspend is denied without prejudice. Movant Stoller may refile the motion if this Court allows him to intervene on remand.Mailed notice (jms, )
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Stollers Motion to Suspend [97, 99 is denied without prejudice. For further details see attached minute order.Mailed notice (tlp, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPLY by Leo Stoller to Google's response to supplement to motion to intervene 16 . (vcf, )
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Mr. Stoller's motion to file reply instanter 103 is granted. Mailed notice (jms, )
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion to file reply instanter 103 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/17/2008 at 09:00 AM. (vcf, )
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller to file reply instanter. (Attachments: # 1 Response)(vcf, )
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Google Inc to motion to intervene 16 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael T. Zeller, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Cyrluk, Jonathan)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to suspend 99 is entered and continued pending ruling on the pending motion.Advised in open court (jms, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion to suspend 99 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/30/2007 at 09:00 AM. (vcf, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller to suspend. (vcf, )
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Mr. Stoller is advised that all motions shall be presented to the court pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a and b). Failure to comply with this rule may result in the striking of the motion. A copy of Local Rule 5.3 (a and b) was mailed to Mr. Stoller along with a copy of this order by the court's clerk.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 07-1569, 07-1612, 07-1651 consisting of one volume of pleadings, two volumes of loose pleadings and four volumes of transcripts. (kjc, )
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller to Suspend; Notice.( Exhibits)(Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on File)(vcf, )
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: It has been brought to the Court's attention that electronic notice of minute entry 93 was not distributed. The Court hereby brings notice to all parties of the filing of minute order 93 . Paper copies of minute entries 93 and 94 will be mailed to all parties. Mailed notice. (kw, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Minute entry 93 is amended to reflect that the Defendant must pay his fine prior to the filing of any papers in this case. In all other respects the minute entry stands. Mailed notice. (kw, )
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Attorney William J. Barrett 88 and to Substitute Jonathan M. Cyrluk as Local Counsel 91 are granted. The Motion to Intervene is reinstated. Plaintiff to supplement the Motion by 6/9/2008; response due 6/30/2008; reply due 7/7/2008. Defendant must pay the fine as ordered by the 7th Circuit by 6/9/2008 or this case will be dismissed. Mailed notice. (kw, ) Modified on 5/23/2008 (kw, ).
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan M. Cyrluk for presentment of motion to substitute attorney, motion to withdraw as attorney 91 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/20/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION by Plaintiff Google Inc to substitute attorney, MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Google Inc to withdraw as attorney (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Google Inc by Jonathan M. Cyrluk (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by William John Barrett for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 88 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/15/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Barrett, William)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff, Google, Inc. (Barrett, William)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall: Status hearing set for 5/15/2008 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (kw, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 4/2/2008; Decided 4/2/2008 in USCA case no. 07-1569, 07-1612 & 07-1651. (kjc, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MANDATE of USCA dated 4/2/2008 regarding notice of appeal 51 , notice of appeal 39 , notice of appeal 63 ; USCA No. 07-1569, 07-1612, 07-1651 ; The ruling on the motions to intervene and the final judgment Vacated and the case Remanded for further proceedings, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (kjc, )
April 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER from the USCA retaining the record on appeal in USCA no. 07-1569, 07-1612, 07-1651 consisting of one volume of pleadings, two volumes of loose pleadings and four volumes of transcripts. (kjc, )
August 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 8/7/2007 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 51 , notice of appeal 39 , notice of appeal 63 ; Appellate case no. : 07-1569, 07-1612, 07-1651 It is ordered that the #1 and #3 are Denied. It is further Ordered that Stoller is fined $10,000, payable to the Clerk of this Court. If this fine is not paid within 14 days, we will enter an order under Support Systems, Int'l, Inc. v. Mack, 45 F.3d 185 (7th Cir. 1995), directing the clerks of all the federal courts in this circuit to return unfiled any papers submitted either directly or indirectly by or on behalf of Stoller unless and until he pays in full the sanction that has been imposed against him. (rp, )
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE by William John Barrett of Change of Address (Barrett, William)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DESIGNATION of supplemental content of record on appeal by Leo Stoller (Exhibits); Notice. (smm)
May 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DESIGNATION of additional content of the record on appeal by Leo Stoller (Exhibit); Notice. (smm)
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion for leave to file designation of supplemental content of record on appeal 75 is denied as moot.Mailed notice (gmr, )
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for leave to file 75 (Barrett, William)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DESIGNATION of supplemental content of record on appeal by Leo Stoller; Notice. (smm)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion for leave to file designation of supplemental content of record on appeal 75 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/14/2007 at 9:00 A.M. (smm)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for leave to file designation of supplemental content of record on appeal. (smm)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit supplemental record on appeal, 51 39 and 63 , (USCA nos. 07-1569, 07-1612, and 07-1651) consisting of one transcript 72 . Mailed copies of USCA transmittal letter and certificate to counsel of record. (ar, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 USCA RECEIVED on 4/12/07 the long record regarding notice of appeal 51 , 39 , 63 ; (07-1569, 07-1612 and 07-1651) (dj, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 02/20/07 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. (ar, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 51 , 39 , 63 (USCA no. 07-1569, 07-1612 and 07-1651) consisting of 1 volume of pleadings, 2 loose pleadings and 3 transcripts. (dj, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DESIGNATION by Leo Stoller of additional content of the record on appeal 46 : USCA Case No. 07-1651 (hp, )
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DESIGNATION by Leo Stoller of Additional Content of the Record on Appeal. (rp, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 COPIES of TRANSCRIPTS of the hearing before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on March 13, 2007, 2) Transcript of the hearing before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on March 19, 2007 and 3) Transcript of the hearing before the Honorable Jack B. Schmetterer on March 1, 2007 by Leo Stoller; Notice. (td, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DESIGNATION of the content by Leo Stoller of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 07-1651 (dj, )
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice. (smm)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 63 ; USCA Case No. 07-1651. (smm)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on 3/23/07 notice of appeal 63 . Notified counsel (dj, )
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of appeal by Leo Stoller regarding orders 58 , 57 ; (Fee Due) (dj, ).
March 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following dates: 2/5/07, 3/13/07 and 3/19/07; Before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall (3 volumes) (eav, )
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice. (rp, )
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 39 ; USCA Case No. 07-1612. (rp, )
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on 3/20/07 notice of appeal 51 . Notified counsel (dj, )
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 REPLY by Movant Leo Stoller to Google's opposition to motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis (eav, ) Modified on 5/17/2007 (vcf, ).
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held on 3/19/2007. For the reasons stated on the record in open court, movant Stoller's motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis 41 is granted.Mailed notice (eav, )
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DESIGNATION by Leo Stoller of the content of the record on appeal : USCA Case No. 07-1569 (dj, )
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of appeal by Leo Stoller regarding orders 46 , 34 ;(Fee Due) (dj, )
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by Google Inc re declaration 49 Notice of Filing (Barrett, William)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Michael T. Zeller regarding response in opposition to motion 47 by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G# 2 Exhibit H-J)(Barrett, William)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Google Inc re response in opposition to motion 47 Notice of Filing (Barrett, William)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 41 (Barrett, William)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :For the reasons stated below, Movant Stoller's motion to reconsider 43 is denied. The presentment date of 3/19/2007 for said motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (gmr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2007 (gmr, ).
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PERMANENT INJUNCTION and Final Judgment as to defendants Central Mfg., Inc. and Stealth Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Kendall on 3/15/2007:Mailed notice(eav, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Joint motion for entry of stipulated permanent injunction and final judgment 23 is granted. Enter permanent injunction and final judgment as to defendants Central Mfg., Inc. and Stealth Industries, Inc.Mailed notice Civil case terminated (eav, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Notice. (smm)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 39 ; USCA Case No. 07-1569. (smm)
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE by Leo Stoller of filing motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 41 (eav, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of under FRCP 59 and/or 60 43 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/19/2007 at 09:00 AM. (eav, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller under FRCP 59 and/or 60 (Exhibits) (eav, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stoller for presentment of motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis 41 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/19/2007 at 09:00 AM. (eav, ) Modified on 5/4/2007 (tg, ).
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION by Movant Leo Stoller for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (eav, ) Modified on 5/4/2007 (tg, ).
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on 3/15/07 notice of appeal 39 . Notified counsel (dj, )
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of appeal by Leo Stoller regarding orders 37 , 38 ; Notice of Filing (Fee Due) (dj, )
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Virginia M. Kendall on 3/12/2007:Mailed notice(eav, )
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :For the reasons set out in the Memorandum Opinion and Order, Motion to intervene 16 is denied; Motion to interplead 8 is denied; and Motions to suspend 9 , 10 , 11 are denied.Mailed notice (eav, )
March 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :On March 2, 2007, Leo Stoller ("Stoller") filed a Motion to Dismiss for failure to join a party -- himself -- pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19. Stoller previously filed a motion to intervene in this action on February 6, 2007. The Court has not yet ruled upon that motion. As such, Stoller remains a non-party and lacks standing to file a motion pursuant to Rule 19. See Arrow v. Gambler's Supply, Inc., 55 F.3d 407, 409 (8th Cir. 1995) ("only a party may make a Rule 19 motion") (citing Thompson v. Boggs, 33 F.3d 847, 858 n. 10 (7th Cir. 1994) (noting lack of any precedent for granting a non-party's motion for joinder)). Accordingly, Stoller's Motion to Dismiss 32 is stricken and the parties need not appear on March 7, 2007.Mailed notice (gmr, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY by Movant Leo Stoller to Google Inc.'s opposition to debtor Leo Stoller's motion to suspend pending the trademark trial and appeal board's decision on defendant's motion for summary judgment 21 (Exhibits); Notice. (smm)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REPLY by Defendant Leo Stolla to Google Inc.'s combined opposition to debtor Leo Stoller's motions (1) to intervene, (2) to interplead, (3) to suspend for sixty days to retain counsel for defendants and (4) to suspend pending appeal to lift automatic stay for Google to sue the debtor ; Notice of filing (eav, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stolla for presentment of motion to dismiss 32 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/7/2007 at 09:00 AM. (eav, )
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant Leo Stolla to dismiss for failure to join a party under Rule F.R.C.P. 19 (eav, )
February 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY by Defendant Leo Stolla to Trustee's Ominibus response in opposition to motions of debtor Leo Stoller to: (1) Intevene; (II) Interplead; (III) Suspend proceeding for sixty days to retain counsel, for defendants; (IV) Suspend pending appeal to lift automactic stay for Google to sue the debtor; and (V) Suspend pending trademark trial and appeal Board's decision for defendants' motion for summary judgment and joinder of responses by Google, Inc.; Notice of filing (eav, )
February 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held. All pending motions are taken under advisement, with a ruling by mail. Status hearing set for 3/13/2007 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (gmr, )
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OBJECTION by Leo Stoller to Joint Moiton for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Inj8unction and Final Judgment; Notice of filing (Exhibits) (eav, )
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority by Leo Stolla ; Notice of filing (eav, )
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc in support of motion for permanent injunction, motion for judgment 23 Google Inc.'s Separate Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment (Barrett, William)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE by Google Inc of Service of the Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment as to Defendants Central Mfg. Inc. and Stealth Industries, Inc.(Proposed Order) (Barrett, William)
February 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT by Google Inc to declaration,, 22 Supplemental Declaration of Michael T. Zeller (Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by William John Barrett for presentment of motion for permanent injunction, motion for judgment 23 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/20/2007 at 09:00 AM. (Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff Google Inc for permanent injunction (Stipulated), MOTION by Plaintiff Google Inc for judgment (Final) (Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Michael T. Zeller regarding response in opposition to motion 21 , response in opposition to motion, 20 by Google Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30)(Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.suspend 10 (Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Google Incin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.interplead 8 , MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.to suspend 9 , MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.to suspend 11 , MOTION by Plaintiff Leo Stolla to intervene 16 (Barrett, William)
February 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by Richard M. Fogel, not individually, but as chapter 7 trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Leo Stollerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.suspend 10 , MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.interplead 8 , MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.to suspend 9 , MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc.to suspend 11 , MOTION by Plaintiff Leo Stolla to intervene 16 and Joinder to Responses of Google Inc. (Alwin, Janice)
February 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion to intervene 16 is entered and continued to 2/20/2007 at 09:00 AM. Any response shall be filed by 2/12/2007. No reply is necessary. The presentment date of 2/12/2007 for said motion is hereby stricken.Mailed notice (gmr, )
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Leo Stolla for motion to intervene 16 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/12/2007 at 9:00 AM. (eav, )
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Leo Stolla to intervene (eav, )
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google Inc as to Stealth Industries, Inc. on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007; Central Mfg. Inc. on 1/23/2007, answer due 2/12/2007. (Barrett, William)
February 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before Judge Virginia M. Kendall :Motion hearing held. Motion to interplead 8 ; Motion to suspend pending the Appeal to lift the automatic stay for Google to sue the debtor Leo Stoller 9 ; Motion to suspend pending the Trademark trial and Appeal Board's decision on the defendant's motion for summary judgment 10 ; and Motion to suspend 11 are entered and continued to 2/20/2007 at 9:00 AM. Responses due by 2/12/2007. No replies are necessary.Mailed notice (gmr, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO SE Appearance by Leo Stolla (eav, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc. for presentment of motion to Interplead 9 , motion to Suspend 10 , motion to Suspend pending Appeal to lift automatic stay for Google to sue the Debtor, Leo Stoller, and 11 , motion to suspend pending the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board's Decision on the defendant's motion for summary judgment 8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/5/2007 at 9:00 AM. (eav, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc. to suspend (eav, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc. to suspend pending the Trademark trial and Appeal Board's decision on the defendant's motion for summary judgment (eav, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc. to suspend pending the Appeal to lift the automatic stay for Google to sue the debtor Leo Stoller (Exhibits) (eav, )
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Stealth Industries, Inc., Central Mfg. Inc. to interplead (Exhibits) (eav, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2007 (eav, ).
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Central Mfg. Inc. (eav, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Google Inc (eav, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Google Inc by William John Barrett (eav, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Google Inc by Michael Thomas Zeller (eav, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (eav, )
January 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc; (eav, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc v. Central Mfg. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mfg. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stealth Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mfg. Inc. and Stealth Industries, by and through Richard M. Fogel, not individually but as Chapter 7 Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Leo Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Richard M. Fogel, not individually, but as chapter 7 trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Leo Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?