Zamecnik et al v. Indian Prairie School District #204 Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Alexander Nuxoll and Heidi Zamecnik
Defendant: Indian Prairie School District #204 Board of Education, Howard Crouse, Michael Popp and Bryan Wells
Case Number: 1:2007cv01586
Filed: March 21, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: William T. Hart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION And Order Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 4/29/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )
April 3, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and Order Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 4/3/2009: Mailed notice(hp, )
March 24, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and Order Signed by the Honorable William T. Hart on 3/24/2009: Mailed notice(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamecnik et al v. Indian Prairie School District #204 Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Prairie School District #204 Board of Education
Represented By: Dawn Marie Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Crouse
Represented By: Dawn Marie Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Popp
Represented By: Dawn Marie Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Wells
Represented By: Dawn Marie Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Nuxoll
Represented By: Agnes E Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Zamecnik
Represented By: Agnes E Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?