Kaufman v. American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Saul M. Kaufman
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv01707
Filed: March 27, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2016 615 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/2/2016. Mailed notice(mjc, )
June 25, 2012 387 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 6/25/2012. (lw, )
March 1, 2012 369 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/1/2012. Final Approval Hearing Held. For the reasons stated in open court on February 29, 2012, and for the reasons stated below, the intervenors' motion to hold defendant and its lead counsel in contempt 243 is denied, Amex's motion for sanctions against the Goodman intervenors 292 is denied, and Amex's motion for a protective order 259 is denied. Counsel shall contact Rhonda Johnson, Courtroom Deputy with a few agreed upon dates for the scheduling of the depositions as indicated in open court. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (lw, ).
January 10, 2011 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/10/2011: Mailed notice (jmp, )
December 22, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/22/2009.(tc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saul M. Kaufman
Represented By: Jordan Rudnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Devereux Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?