FM. Industries, Inc. v. Citicorp Credit Services, Inc., et.al.

Plaintiff: FM. Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Citicorp Credit Services, Inc., Jeanette Brown, John Gillard, Law Office of Ross Gelfand, LLC and James D Cortez
Petitioner: Michael E Friedman
Case Number: 1:2007cv01794
Filed: April 2, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Suzanne B. Conlon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2009 649 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Morton Denlow on 9/3/2009:Mailed notice(dmk, )
February 4, 2009 553 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 2/4/2009:Notices mailed by Judicial staff. notice(wyh, )
October 21, 2008 532 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 10/21/2008:Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (wyh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FM. Industries, Inc. v. Citicorp Credit Services, Inc., et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FM. Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William T. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citicorp Credit Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette Brown
Represented By: Robert K. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gillard
Represented By: Robert K. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Ross Gelfand, LLC
Represented By: Mark Herbert Remus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael E Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?