Cooper et al v. Daley et al

Plaintiff: Zion Cooper, Markee Cooper, Sr. and Markee Cooper, Jr.
Defendant: M. Bonstetter, F Mack, S. Daley, J. Frano, R. Pucillo, W. Johnson, A. Monaco, S. Lauretto, V. Fico, L. Willems, M. Napoli, S. Reina, D Ross, G. De Salvo and City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2007cv02144
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 399 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/22/2013: Before the Court are Defendants' motions for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Rule 50(a) 344 and Defendants motion for judgment notwithstanding the verdict pur suant to Rule 50(b) or, in the alternative, fora new trial pursuant to Rule 59(a) or remittitur 364 . Also before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion to reopen Monell discovery 352 and Defendant City of Chicago's motion to bar the Monell cla im for lack of jurisdiction 360 . For the reasons stated below, Defendants' Rule 50(a) motion 344 is denied as moot and the Monell motions [352, 360] are stricken as moot. The parties are directed to submit to the Courts Proposed Order Box a clean copy of the agreed certification resolving Plaintiffs' Monell claim [see 360, 386, 392]. The parties are also directed to amend their Rule 50(b) motion 364 and response 372 to include citations to the trial transcript. If the pertinent transcripts have not yet been obtained, the parties are to consult with the Court Reporter and submit no later than 2/1/2013 a proposed schedule for submitting the briefs with citations to the trial transcript. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 9, 2012 344 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants M. Bonstetter, S. Daley, F Mack, S. Reina, D Ross for judgment for Defendants as Matter of Law Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 50 (Mitchell, Gregory)
May 16, 2012 260 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/16/2012:Before the Court are Plaintiffs' and Defendants' motions in limine 232 . For the reasons below, Plaintiffs' motions are granted in part and denied in part and Defendants' motions are granted in part and denied in part. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 28, 2011 218 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/28/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
September 23, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/23/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 31, 2010 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/31/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Daley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bonstetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Mack
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Daley
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Frano
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pucillo
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Johnson
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Monaco
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lauretto
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Fico
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Willems
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Napoli
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Reina
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Ross
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. De Salvo
Represented By: Gregory T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zion Cooper
Represented By: Michael Oppenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markee Cooper, Sr.
Represented By: Brendan Shiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markee Cooper, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Shiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?