Foxe v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sonja Foxe
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc., John Does, Safeway Inc. and Menu Foods Income Fund
Case Number: 1:2007cv02237
Filed: April 24, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2007 13
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Wayne R. Andersen for all further proceedings.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/5/07. Finding of relatedness pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. (For further details see order).(rbf, )
July 3, 2007 12
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :Pursuant to order dated 6/29/2007 reassigning this case to Judge Andersen the status set for 7/5/2007 before Judge St. Eve is stricken.Mailed notice (tmh, )
June 29, 2007 9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund by William Christopher Martin (Martin, William)
June 27, 2007 8
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :Status hearing set for 6/28/2007 is stricken and reset to 7/5/2007 at 08:45 AM.Mailed notice (tmh, )
June 14, 2007 7
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Case called for status hearing. Plaintiff fails to appear.Status hearing is reset for 6/28/2007 at 08:30 AM. Plaintiff is advised that failure to appear on 6/28/2007 at 8:30 am may result in dismissal of this case.Mailed notice (jms, )
June 1, 2007 6
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2007. Initial Status hearing set for 6/14/2007 at 08:30 AM. in courtroom 1241.Mailed notice (tmh, )
April 24, 2007 5
SUMMONS Issued 3 original and 3 copies as to Defendants Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Income Fund, Safeway Inc. (rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foxe v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Foxe
Represented By: John Harry Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: William Christopher Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?