Glazer v. Abercrombie & Kent, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Donald W Glazer
Defendant: Abercrombie & Kent, Inc., Geoffrey Kent, Andrew Harper Travel, Inc. and Andrew Harper
Case Number: 1:2007cv02284
Filed: April 24, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: George W. Lindberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2009 235 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George W. Lindberg on 9/22/2009:Mailed notice(slb, )
March 24, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George W. Lindberg on 3/24/2009:Mailed notice(slb, )
November 10, 2008 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George W. Lindberg on 11/10/2008:Mailed notice(slb, )
September 23, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George W. Lindberg on 9/23/2008:Mailed notice(slb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glazer v. Abercrombie & Kent, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W Glazer
Represented By: Michael E. Patunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Kent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Harper Travel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?