Khan et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Shahid R Khan and Ann C Khan
Defendant: United States of America and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2007cv02570
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Champaign
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Miscellaneous Cases
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2009 56 BILL of Costs from the USCA, appeal no. 08-1743. (ep, )
January 12, 2009 55 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued October 31, 2008; Decided November 20, 2008 in USCA case no. 08-1743. (ep, )
January 12, 2009 54 MANDATE of USCA dated 11/20/2008 regarding notice of appeal 46 ; USCA No. 08-1743. We REVERSE the district court's holding, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (ep, )
January 12, 2009 53 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 12/4/2008 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal 46 ; Appellate case no. : 08-1743. For the foregoing reasons, we REVERSE the district court's holding and we REMAND for the district court to consider taxpayers' remaining challenges to enforcement of the summonses. (ep, )
January 12, 2009 52 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 08-1743 consisting of six volumes of pleadings, two volumes of loose pleadings and one sealed envelope. (ep, )
April 17, 2008 51 USCA RECEIVED on 4/17/08 the long record. (air, )
April 17, 2008 50 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 46 (USCA no. 08-1743) consisting of one vol. of pleadings, one vaulted item and two vol. of loose pleadings. (air, )
March 28, 2008 49 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 46 ; USCA Case No. 08-1743. (td, )
March 27, 2008 48 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (air, )
March 27, 2008 47 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 46 . Notified counsel (air, )
March 26, 2008 46 NOTICE of appeal by United States of America regarding orders 45 (Miller, Gerald)
January 28, 2008 45 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by courtroom deputy to Judge Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2008: Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 28, 2008 44 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2008: Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 28, 2008 43 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : *(This Order concerns consolidated cases 07 C 2571, 07 C 2573, 07 C 2574, 07 C 2575 and 07 C 2583). Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Petitioners' motion to quash 1 is granted, and the Government's motion to enforce the summonses 28 is denied. Petitioners' request for discovery is moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in favor of the Petitioners in this case and all of the consolidated cases. Each party will bear their own costs. Mailed notice (jmp, )
January 11, 2008 42 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Pursuant to LR. 26.2.(rbf, )
January 4, 2008 41 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Pursuant to various exceptions to the prohibition on disclosure of taxpayer return information stated in 26 U.S.C. 6103 the government is ordered to produce an affidavit, in camera, stating whether or not a Justice Department referral is in effect with respect to Robert Greisman, and if so, when the referral occurred. This affidavit is due by January 11, 2008.Mailed notice (rao, )
November 15, 2007 40 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Enforcement of IRS Summons (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hellerman, Richard)
November 15, 2007 39 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Motion hearing set for 11/20/2007 is vacated. Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file surreply 36 is granted.Mailed notice (rao, )
November 9, 2007 38 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Keith Hellerman for presentment of before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/20/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Hellerman, Richard)
November 9, 2007 37 SUR-REPLY by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan To Defendant's Reply To Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Enforcement of IRS Summons (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)(Hellerman, Richard)
November 9, 2007 36 MOTION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan for leave to file Sur-Reply (Hellerman, Richard)
November 8, 2007 35 REPLY by Defendant United States of America to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for enforcement of IRS summons. (rbf, )
November 8, 2007 34 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Motion hearing set for 11/14/2007 is vacated. United States' motion for leave to file reply, and brief in support 32 is granted.Mailed notice (rao, )
November 7, 2007 33 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Lan Davis for presentment of motion for leave to file 32 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 11/14/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Davis, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2007 32 MOTION by Defendant United States of America for leave to file Reply (Attachments: # 1 Reply)(Davis, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2007 31 REPLY by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to Defendant's Opposition to Petition to Quash Motion for Enforcement of IRS Summons (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration# 2 Exhibit Declaration)(Hellerman, Richard)
September 28, 2007 30 DECLARATION of Revenue Agent Weinger regarding Response 28 by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons# 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript# 3 Exhibit 3 - Summons# 4 Exhibit 4 - Consulting Agreements# 5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit# 6 Exhibit 6 - Memorandum# 7 Exhibit 7 - Best Practices document# 8 Exhibit 8 - First Check document# 9 Exhibit 9 - Email# 10 Exhibit 10 - Opinion# 11 Exhibit 11 - Invoice# 12 Errata 12 - Letter# 13 Exhibit 13 - Minutes# 14 Exhibit 14 - Notice# 15 Exhibit 15 - Paper# 16 Exhibit 16 - Declaration# 17 Exhibit 17 - Privilege Log# 18 Exhibit 18 - Checksheet# 19 Exhibit 19 - Contract)(Davis, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2007 29 Exhibit by Internal Revenue Service to Response to Petition (Davis, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2007 28 RESPONSE by Defendant Internal Revenue Service to other 21 (Davis, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2007 27 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :United States' unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to Petitioner's memorandum in support of petition to quash and reply to response 25 is granted. United States' response to Petitioner's motion to quash 1 is due on or before 10/1/2007. Petitioner's reply will be due on or before 10/23/2007. The Court will rule by mail. Motion hearing set for 9/18/2007 is vacated.Mailed notice (rao, )
September 12, 2007 26 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Lan Davis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 25 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/18/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Davis, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2007 25 MOTION by Defendant United States of America for extension of time to file response/reply as to other 21 (UNOPPOSED) (Davis, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2007 24 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :United States' unopposed motion for extension of time to file response to petitioners' memorandum in support of petition to quash and reply to response 22 is granted. Respondent's response will be due on or before 9/17/2007. Petitioner's reply will be due on or before 10/9/2007. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (rao, )
September 6, 2007 23 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Lan Davis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 22 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 9/12/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Davis, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2007 22 MOTION by Defendant United States of America for extension of time to file response/reply as to other 21 (UNOPPOSED) (Davis, Elizabeth)
August 10, 2007 21 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Petitions to Quash Summons by Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan (Hellerman, Richard)
August 8, 2007 20 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Motion hearing held on 8/8/2007. Plaintiffs' motion for issuance of summons 16 is denied for the reasons stated in open court. Mailed notice (rao, )
August 1, 2007 19 RESPONSE by United States of Americain Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to consolidate cases Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of Summons 16 (Davis, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2007 17 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Keith Hellerman for presentment of before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/8/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Hellerman, Richard)
July 27, 2007 16 MOTION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to consolidate cases Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of Summons (Hellerman, Richard)
July 26, 2007 18 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan by David D Aughtry; Order entered granting leave by Judge Ruben Castillo. Filing fee $ 50 paid, receipt number 10647657. (rbf, )
July 24, 2007 14 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : *(This order concerns consolidated cases 07 C 2571, 07 C 2573, 07 C 2574, 07 C 2575, and 07 C 2583.) The Clerk of Court is also ordered to issue summons in cases 07 C 2571, 07 C 2573, 07 C 2574, 07 C 2575, and 07 C 2583. Mailed notice (rbf, )
July 23, 2007 15 RETURN receipt of certified mail no 7006 2150 0005 2032 2362 received on 7/16/07. (rbf, )
July 11, 2007 SUMMONS Issued to plaintiffs' counsel via certified mail number 7006 2150 0005 2032 2362 for issuance as to United States of America, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to minute order dated 7/10/07. (rbf, )
July 10, 2007 13 MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo :Plaintiff's motion to consolidate Case Nos. 07c2571, 07cv2573, 07c2574, 07c2575 and 07c2583 7 is granted. United States' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for an order directing the Clerk of Court to issue summons 11 is granted in the alternative relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summons to the Plaintiffs so that service of process upon the United States can be completed. Plaintiffs' memorandum in support of their motions to quash summons will be due on or before 8/10/07. Defendants' response will be due on or before 9/10/07. Plaintiffs' reply will be due on or before 10/1/07. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (rbf, )
July 6, 2007 12 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Lan Davis for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 11 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/17/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Davis, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2007 11 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(Davis, Elizabeth)
July 5, 2007 10 RESPONSE by Internal Revenue Service to MOTION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to consolidate cases 7 and Notice of Failure of Service of Process (Davis, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2007 9 Plaintiffs NOTICE of Motion by Richard Keith Hellerman for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 7 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 7/10/2007 at 09:45 AM. (Hellerman, Richard)
July 3, 2007 8 PETITION motion to consolidate cases 7 by Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan (Attachments: # 1 Petition SRK Wilshire Part 2# 2 Shahid & Ann Khan Part 3# 3 Uviado Part 4# 4 Jonction Part 5# 5 SRK Wilshire Investor Part 6)(Hellerman, Richard)
July 3, 2007 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to consolidate cases (Hellerman, Richard)
June 25, 2007 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States of America by Elizabeth Lan Davis (Davis, Elizabeth)
May 7, 2007 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan by David D Aughtry. (rbf, )
May 7, 2007 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan by Richard Keith Hellerman. (rbf, )
May 7, 2007 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (rbf, )
May 7, 2007 1 PETITION by Plaintiffs Shahid R Khan, Ann C Khan to quash summons. (rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahid R Khan
Represented By: Richard Keith Hellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann C Khan
Represented By: Richard Keith Hellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?