United States Fidelity And Guaranty Company v. Shorenstein Realty Services, LP et al

Plaintiff: United States Fidelity And Guaranty Company
Defendant: Shorenstein Realty Services, LP, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Company, LLC, SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc. and 175 East Delaware Place Homeowners Association
Case Number: 1:2007cv03179
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 443 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Third Party Plaintiffs National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, LP for judgment Motion for Entry of Judgment Order pursuant to Rule 58 (Underwood, Thomas)
April 12, 2013 426 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Third Party Plaintiffs National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, LP for judgment (Underwood, Thomas)
August 16, 2011 399 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/16/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
June 3, 2011 345 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Third Party Plaintiffs National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, LP for judgment Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Rule 58 (Sanders, Michael)
May 11, 2011 341 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/11/2011. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
December 3, 2010 294 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Third Party Plaintiffs National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc. , SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, L P, Shorenstein Realty Services, LP, Counter Claimants National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, LP, Defendants SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc., SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC, Shorenstein Company, LLC, Shorenstein Management, Inc., Shorenstein Realty Services, LP for judgment on Damages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 10, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 11 - 25, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 26-28)(Underwood, Thomas)
November 18, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Nan R Nolan: For the reasons explained below, AMICOs Motion to Modify Confidentiality Order 279 is denied.[For further details see text below.]Mailed notice(lxs, )
March 25, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/25/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )
December 8, 2008 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/8/2008:Mailed notice(mpj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fidelity And Guaranty Company v. Shorenstein Realty Services, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fidelity And Guaranty Company
Represented By: Carrie Anne Von Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorenstein Realty Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorenstein Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorenstein Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI Michigan Avenue Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRI Michigan Avenue Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 175 East Delaware Place Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?