Raybourne v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York

Plaintiff: Edward Raybourne
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 1:2007cv03205
Filed: June 7, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: McHenry
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/8/2011: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 23, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Edward Raybourne for judgment entry (DeBofsky, Mark)
February 8, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/8/2010.(smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raybourne v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Raybourne
Represented By: Mark D. DeBofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?