Nike, Inc. v. Geox USA, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Nike, Inc.
Defendant: Geox USA, Inc. and Geox S.P.A.
Case Number: 1:2007cv04062
Filed: July 19, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2007 10
MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 9/24/2007. Status hearing set for 11/21/2007 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 23, 2007 9
MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing set for 9/24/2007 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2119. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 19, 2007 8
NOTICE by Nike, Inc. of Claim involving a patent under Local Rule 3.4. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nike, Inc. v. Geox USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geox USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geox S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nike, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Renk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?