Lewitton v. ITA Software, Inc.

Plaintiff: Derek Lewitton
Defendant: ITA Software, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv04210
Filed: July 26, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/24/2011: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs motion for modification of the November 30 order 110 is granted in part and denied in part. Consistent with the discussion at the Jan uary 14 hearing and in the exercise of its authority to protect and effectuate its prior rulings (see McCann v. Kerner, 436 F.2d 1342, 1343 (7th Cir. 1971)), the Court clarifies its November 30 order as follows: (1) ITA is required to cashlessly exer cise Lewittons ITA options in the event that the ITA-Google merger closes before the passing of the deadline for theexercise of Lewittons options; and (2) ITA must take formal Board action on any request by Lewitton to use ITA shares instead of cash to either exercise his options or cover his tax withholding obligations upon exercise. In view of the period of time that lapsed while the parties effectuated the clarification to the November 30 order pertaining to Lewittons request for Board action , the Court tolls by five days the 60-day period provided in the November 30 order. Accordingly, the deadline for the exercise of Lewittons options is extended to February 3, 2011. The Court respectfully denies Lewittons motion in all other respects.1 Defendants motion for leave to file a sur-reply 120 is granted. Notices Mailed by Judicial Staff notice(tbk, )
November 30, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/30/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 29, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/29/2008:Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewitton v. ITA Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Lewitton
Represented By: Donald Joseph Mizerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITA Software, Inc.
Represented By: Max A Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?