McDonald's Corporation et al v. China Retail Management Limited et al Featured Case

Plaintiff McDonald\'s Corporation alleges that defendant China Retail Management Limited breached its obligation under its License Agreement by failing to market McKids Brand and other McDonald\'s brands in a number of Asian markets, as well as failing to make required guaranteed payments. Plaintiff also alleges that defendant Cornerstone Overseas Investment Limited had guaranteed the performance of China Retail Management Limited but failed to fulfill the guarantee.

Plaintiff: DIC Entertainment Corporation and McDonald's Corporation
Defendant: Cornerstone Overseas Investment Limited and China Retail Management Limited
Case Number: 1:2007cv04443
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2007 14
MINUTE entry before Judge David H. Coar :Pursuant to the notice of dismissal 13, this action is dismissed. Civil case termianted.Mailed notice (pm, )
September 18, 2007 13
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by all plaintiffs (Burden, Ashley)
August 31, 2007 12
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by McDonald's Corporation, DIC Entertainment Corporation. Cornerstone Overseas Investment Limited waiver sent on 8/30/2007, answer due 10/29/2007. (Burden, Ashley)
August 16, 2007 10
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs McDonald's Corporation and DIC Entertainment Corporation by Ashley John Burden. (vcf, )
August 10, 2007 9
SUPPLEMENT by McDonald's Corporation to Disclosure Statement (Grassmick, David)
August 7, 2007 8
DISCLOSURE statement by DIC Entertainment Corporation. (vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald's Corporation et al v. China Retail Management Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIC Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Ashley John Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: David E Grassmick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Overseas Investment Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Retail Management Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?