Tomas v. The State of Illinois, Illinois Department of Employment Security

Plaintiff: Susan M. Tomas
Defendant: The State of Illinois, Illinois Department of Employment Security
Case Number: 1:2007cv04542
Filed: August 13, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2015 244 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 236 is granted. See Order for further details. Signed by the Honorable James B. Zagel on 11/9/2015. Mailed notice(ep, )
September 2, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 9/2/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )
November 13, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/13/2008:Mailed notice(drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomas v. The State of Illinois, Illinois Department of Employment Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan M. Tomas
Represented By: John Craig Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Illinois, Illinois Department of Employment Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?