Bobak Sausage Company v. A&J Seven Bridges Inc et al

Plaintiff: Bobak Sausage Company
Defendant: A&J Seven Bridges Inc, John Bobak and Anna Zalinski
Case Number: 1:2007cv04718
Filed: August 21, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/31/2011: Following entry of judgment in its favor, on April 6, 2011, Defendants submitted a bill of costs 90 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). On April 12, 2011, the C ourt took the bill of costs under advisement and gave Plaintiff until April 26, 2011, to object. Plaintiff has not filed an objection to the bill of costs. For the reasons stated below, the Court grants Defendants' request for costs 90 and awards Defendants $2,829.00 in costs. Mailed notice. [For further details see written opinion.] (kj, )
March 28, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/28/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )
April 26, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 4/26/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 5, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/5/2008:Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobak Sausage Company v. A&J Seven Bridges Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobak Sausage Company
Represented By: Ethan F Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&J Seven Bridges Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bobak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Zalinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?