Killian v. Concert Health Plan

Plaintiff: James E Killian
Defendant: Concert Health Plan
Case Number: 1:2007cv04755
Filed: August 22, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Kane
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 476 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/22/2014.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
December 17, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 12/17/2010.Mailed notice.(jlj)
July 28, 2010 294 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/28/2010:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
July 6, 2010 289 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/6/2010:Judivial staff mailed notice(gl, )
August 27, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/27/2009:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killian v. Concert Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Killian
Represented By: David Ryan Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concert Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?