Lupescu v. Chertoff et al

Plaintiff: Norman P. Lupescu
Defendant: Michael Chertoff and Transportation Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2007cv04821
Filed: August 27, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 347 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/26/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law and also denies defendant's request for a new trial, with the exception of defendant's argument that the damage award was excessive, which the Court takes under advisement. (mk)
April 6, 2011 272 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/6/2011: The defendant's motion for finding of rebuttal comparators 267 is denied. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
December 23, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 12/23/2010: The defendant's motion in limine to question plaintiff on mitigation of damages 145 is granted in part. The plaintiffs motion to reconsider order on defendant's mo tion in limine 143 is granted. The plaintiff'smotion for extension of time to respond to defendant's motion in limine to exclude Maiysha Howard 159 is granted, although the court notes that this motion raises difficulties and threatens to prejudice both the defendant and the court. The court will consider the outstanding issue raised by the defendant's motion in limine to exclude Maiysha Howard and certain exhibits 153 on the first day of trial (January 3). It does not appea r that the defendant has included Howard's entire job application (the court was not able to locate eithera date or Howard's signature). The defendant is directed to provide Howard's application, in its entirety, to the court as soon as possible. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
October 22, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/22/2010: The parties are advised as follows. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
March 19, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/19/2010. (ber, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupescu v. Chertoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman P. Lupescu
Represented By: Dana L. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chertoff
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Security Administration
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?