Trujillo v. Apple Computer, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendants Apple Computer, Inc. and AT&T, Inc. purposefully and fraudulently concealed that cost of replacing the iPhone battery, as well as the life span of the iPhone battery.

Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC and Apple Computer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv04946
Filed: August 31, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2009 158 Featured Case ENTERED JUDGMENT (vmj, )
March 6, 2009 157 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Apple Computer Inc., and dismissing plaintiffs' claims against AT&T Mobility, LLC with prejudice and without costs. Mailed (vmj, )
February 19, 2009 156 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff and defendant, AT&T Mobility LLC, having filed a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (a)(1)(ii) this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(air, )
February 19, 2009 155 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant AT&T Mobility (Drury, Larry)
February 11, 2009 154 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This court's minute entry of 2/11/09 is modified as follows: Status hearing set for 2/19/2009 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice(air, )
February 11, 2009 153 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Settlement has been reached. Status hearing set for 3/19/09 at 9:30 a.m. All pending motions continued to next status hearing date. Mailed notice(air, )
January 20, 2009 152 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Plaintiff's 56(f) submission is to be made by 2/3/2009. All pending motions are continued to 2/11/2009 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
January 14, 2009 151 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Emily M. Emerson for presentment of motion to stay 150 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/20/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Emerson, Emily)
January 14, 2009 150 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion For Class Certification Pending Resolution of AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion For Summary Judgment. (Emerson, Emily)
January 9, 2009 149 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Emily M. Emerson for presentment of motion for summary judgment 146 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/20/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Emerson, Emily)
January 9, 2009 148 Featured Case Rule 56.1 STATEMENT by AT&T Mobility, LLC of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Its Motion For Summary Judgment. (Collado, Victoria)
January 9, 2009 147 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by AT&T Mobility, LLC in support of motion for summary judgment 146 (Collado, Victoria)
January 9, 2009 146 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for summary judgment (Reynolds, Sarah)
January 9, 2009 145 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC by Emily M. Emerson (Emerson, Emily)
January 8, 2009 144 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Larry D. Drury for presentment of extension of time 143 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/20/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Drury, Larry)
January 8, 2009 143 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo for extension of time to file his brief in support of his Motion for Class Certification (Drury, Larry)
December 16, 2008 142 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held. Memorandum in support of class certification is due by 1/13/2009. Response due by 2/13/2009; Reply due by 2/27/2009. (or, )
December 12, 2008 141 Featured Case ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses. by AT&T Mobility, LLC(Collado, Victoria)
December 5, 2008 140 Featured Case Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Apple Computer, Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope)
November 25, 2008 139 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 12/16/2008 at 09:30 AM. Answer to first amended complaint is to be filed by 12/12/2008. (or, )
November 25, 2008 138 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to certify class 137 (Drury, Larry)
November 25, 2008 137 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to certify class (Drury, Larry)
October 15, 2008 136 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held on 10/15/2008 and continued to 11/25/2008 at 09:30 AM. Based on report by counsel, the Court determines that further consideration of the imposition of sanctions is unnecessary. Deadline for amending pleadings and adding parties is 11/21/2008. Stay of discovery is lifted. (or, )
October 8, 2008 135 Featured Case STATUS Report by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Reynolds, Sarah)
September 29, 2008 134 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held and continued to 10/15/2008 at 9:30 a.m. Oral motion to vacate stay is entered and continued to 10/15/08. Mailed (vmj, )
September 23, 2008 133 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/23/2008(vmj, )
September 23, 2008 132 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the court grants defendant Apple Computer, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment [53}. Mailed (vmj, )
September 22, 2008 131 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/22/2008(vmj, )
September 22, 2008 130 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the court denies defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's motion to compel arbitration and dismiss action 36 . The case is set for a status hearing on 9/29/2008 at 9:30 a.m. to address further the sanctions issue discussed earlier in this decision. Mailed (vmj, )
July 28, 2008 129 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's motion for leave to file supplemental authority 122 is granted. Mailed (vmj, )
July 25, 2008 128 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. regarding declaration 126 , reply 125 , memorandum in support of motion 124 , declaration, 127 (Stanton, Patrick)
July 25, 2008 127 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Muhlbach in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew Muhlbach, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andrew Muhlbach, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Andrew Muhlbach, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Andrew Muhlbach)(Stanton, Patrick)
July 25, 2008 126 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jennifer Hakes in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
July 25, 2008 125 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. to Plaintiff's Response to its Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
July 25, 2008 124 Featured Case MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
July 23, 2008 123 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion for leave to file 122 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/29/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
July 23, 2008 122 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for leave to file Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Sarah)
July 11, 2008 121 Featured Case NOTICE by Patrick Thomas Stanton of Change of Address (Stanton, Patrick)
July 8, 2008 120 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Nunc pro tunc 6/23/08: Defendant'smotion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority is granted. Mailed (vmj, )
July 2, 2008 119 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re Response 118 , response in opposition to motion, 117 (Rowe, James)
July 2, 2008 118 Featured Case RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to Rule 56 statement 55 (Rowe, James)
July 2, 2008 117 Featured Case RESPONSE by Jose Trujilloin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Rowe, James)
June 16, 2008 116 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Archis A. Parasharami for presentment of motion for leave to file 115 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/24/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Parasharami, Archis)
June 16, 2008 115 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for leave to file Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Parasharami, Archis)
June 11, 2008 114 Featured Case {PROPOSED} Stipulated Protective Order re. the disclosure of confidential information Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/11/2008(vmj, )
June 10, 2008 113 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file response to defendant Apple Computer's motion for summary judgment is granted. Response to motion is to be filed by 7/3/08; reply is to be filed by 7/25/08. Defendant Apple's agreed motion for entry of stipulated protective order is granted, provided that paragraph 11(b) of the proposed draft order is to be amended to include a sentence stating that a copy of the complete, unredacted version of any such submission is to be submitted to chambers at the time of filing. Defendant is directed to submit an electronic version of the conformed order, following the directions on Judge Kennelly's web page. Mailed (vmj, )
June 4, 2008 112 Featured Case Present Agreed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Business Information NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Thomas Stanton for presentment of motion for protective order, 111 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/10/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Stanton, Patrick)
June 4, 2008 111 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for protective order Defendant Apple Inc.'s Agreed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Business Information (Attachments: # 1 {Proposed} Stipulated Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure of Confidential Information)(Stanton, Patrick)
May 27, 2008 110 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James R. Rowe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, motion for relief 109 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/10/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Rowe, James)
May 27, 2008 109 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion for summary judgment 53 AGREED (Rowe, James)
May 27, 2008 108 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re response in opposition to motion 107 (Rowe, James)
May 27, 2008 107 Featured Case RESPONSE by Jose Trujilloin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action 36 (Rowe, James)
May 19, 2008 106 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ramoncito Balce regarding memorandum 102 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Parasharami, Archis)
May 19, 2008 105 Featured Case DECLARATION of Patrick Eckstrand regarding memorandum 102 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Parasharami, Archis)
May 19, 2008 104 Featured Case DECLARATION of Diane Bonina regarding memorandum 102 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Parasharami, Archis)
May 19, 2008 103 Featured Case DECLARATION of Neal S. Berinhout regarding memorandum 102 by AT&T Mobility, LLC Third Supplemental Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout (Parasharami, Archis)
May 19, 2008 102 Featured Case MEMORANDUM motion to compel 36 by AT&T Mobility, LLC Third Supplemental Brief in Support of ATTM's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (Parasharami, Archis)
May 8, 2008 101 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Hearing held on motion for leave to file supplemental authority. Motion granted (96 and 99). Supplemental memorandum by AT&T due 5/19/2008. Plaintiff's response due 6/2/2008. Defendant's reply limited to the affidavits only due 6/9/2008. Plaintiff's motion to supplement authority is granted (94). Mailed notice (kj, )
May 5, 2008 100 Featured Case Note: Document #99 is Related to Document #94. NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion for leave to file, 99 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/8/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
May 5, 2008 99 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for leave to file Supplemental Authority In Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action. AT&T Mobility LLC's Corrected Response to Plaintiff's Motion For leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reynolds, Sarah)
May 5, 2008 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Second Supplemental Brief In Support of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action, Document #37. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neal S. Berinhout, # 2 Declaration of Harry Bennett, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Reynolds, Sarah)
May 5, 2008 97 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion for leave to file, 96 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/8/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
May 5, 2008 96 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for leave to file Supplemental Authority In Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action. AT&T Mobility LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, Document #94. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Supplement Second Supplemental Brief, # 3 Declaration Neal S. Berinhout, # 4 Declaration Harry Bennett, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Reynolds, Sarah)
May 1, 2008 95 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James R. Rowe for presentment of motion to supplement 94 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/8/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Rowe, James)
May 1, 2008 94 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to supplement authority in support of his Response to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rowe, James)
April 18, 2008 93 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/18/2008(vmj, )
April 18, 2008 92 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the court directs AT&T Mobility to provide a supplemental submission in support of its motion to compel arbitration, on or before 5/5/2008. The submission, exclusive of affidavits and other supporting materials, may not exceed five pages. Trujillo is directed to provide a supplemental submission, subject to the same page limitations, on or before 5/18/2008. If (and only if) Trujillo submits an affidavit or other eivdence, AT&T may file a reply, not to exceed five pages, on or before 5/27/2008. Mailed (vmj, )
April 15, 2008 91 Featured Case STATEMENT by AT&T Mobility, LLC of Citizenship (Reynolds, Sarah)
April 14, 2008 90 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: For the reasons stated below, the court directs defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to file, by no later than 4/16/2008, a complete statement regarding its citizenship, as more fully described below. Mailed (vmj, )
April 11, 2008 89 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to motion to compel 36 (Supplemental Brief) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Williams)(Reynolds, Sarah)
April 7, 2008 88 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing held on 4/7/2008. (or, )
April 3, 2008 87 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo (Rowe, James)
April 3, 2008 86 Featured Case RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo in supplement to his Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, and to Defendant's Citation to Supplemental Authority (Rowe, James)
April 2, 2008 85 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motion to supplement 82 is granted. Response to motion for summary judgment, limited to five pages is to be filed by 4/8/2008. Reply brief, limited to five pages, is to be filed by 4/14/2008. (or, )
April 2, 2008 84 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's motion for leave to file notice of supplemental authority 80 is granted. The court advises they anticipate ruling on the motion to compel arbitration within the next seven days. Mailed
April 1, 2008 83 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Larry Daniel Drury for presentment of motion to supplement 82 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/2/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Drury, Larry)
April 1, 2008 82 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to supplement His Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, and for Leave to File His Response to Defendant's Supplemental Authority (Drury, Larry)
March 27, 2008 81 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion for leave to file 80 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/2/2008 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
March 27, 2008 80 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for leave to file supplemental authority in support of Its motion to compel arbitration and dismiss action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Sarah)
January 17, 2008 79 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly :Motion to certify class 8 is withdrawn. Motion for preservation of documents 9 is withdrawn. Status hearing held on 1/17/2008 and continued to 4/7/2008 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
January 11, 2008 78 Featured Case DECLARATION of Neal S. Berinhout regarding motion to compel 36 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Reynolds, Sarah)
January 11, 2008 77 Featured Case REPLY by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC In Support Of Motion To Compel Arbitration And Dismiss Action (Reynolds, Sarah)
January 3, 2008 76 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly :Status hearing held on 1/3/2008 and continued to 1/17/2008 at 09:30 AM. Motion to preserve documents and motion to certify class entered and continued to 1/17/2008 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff's discovery cutoff relating to motion for summary judgment set to 5/2/2008. Plaintiff's response to motion for summary judgment due by 6/2/2008, and reply by 6/23/2008. (or, )
January 2, 2008 75 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. regarding statement 74 (Stanton, Patrick)
January 2, 2008 74 Featured Case Joint Statement Regarding Discovery STATEMENT by Apple Computer, Inc., Jose Trujillo (Stanton, Patrick)
December 18, 2007 73 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re response to motion 72 with Certificate of Service (Rowe, James)
December 18, 2007 72 Featured Case RESPONSE by Jose Trujillo to MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action 36 (Rowe, James)
December 13, 2007 71 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly :Status hearing held on 12/13/2007 and continued to 1/3/2008 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
December 7, 2007 70 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. regarding declaration 69 , declaration 65 , declaration 68 , declaration 66 , declaration 62 , declaration 63 , declaration 67 , declaration 64 Color Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Douglas Vincent in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, Color Exhibit A to Declaration of Peggy Jensen in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment and Color Exhibits A-B to Declaration of Lance Kunnuth in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 69 Featured Case DECLARATION of Peggy Jensen regarding affidavit in support of motion 57 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit A to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 68 Featured Case DECLARATION of Lance Kunnuth regarding affidavit in support of motion 59 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit B to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 67 Featured Case DECLARATION of Lance Kunnuth regarding affidavit in support of motion 59 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit A to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 66 Featured Case DECLARATION of Douglas Vincent regarding affidavit in support of motion 56 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit E to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 65 Featured Case DECLARATION of Douglas Vincent regarding affidavit in support of motion 56 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit D to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 64 Featured Case DECLARATION of Douglas Vincent regarding affidavit in support of motion 56 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit C to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 63 Featured Case DECLARATION of Douglas Vincent regarding affidavit in support of motion 56 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit B to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 62 Featured Case DECLARATION of Douglas Vincent regarding affidavit in support of motion 56 by Apple Computer, Inc. Exhibit A to Declaration (In Color) (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 61 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. regarding affidavit in support of motion 59 , affidavit in support of motion 60 , affidavit in support of motion 57 , affidavit in support of motion, 58 , memorandum in support of motion 54 , Rule 56 statement 55 , affidavit in support of motion 56 , MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 60 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 Declaration of Arin Knuth in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 59 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 Declaration of Lance Kunnuth in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 58 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 Declaration of Carol Jinks in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment - Declaration Parts 1 through 4 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jinks Affidavit Part 2# 2 Affidavit Jinks Declaration Part 3# 3 Affidavit Jinks Declaration Part 4)(Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 57 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 Declaration of Peggy Jensen in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 56 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. in Support of MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment 53 Declaration of Douglas Vincent in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 55 Featured Case RULE 56 FRCP Rule 56.1 Statement by Apple Computer, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment 53 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by Apple Computer, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment 53 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
December 7, 2007 53 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. for summary judgment (Stanton, Patrick)
November 14, 2007 52 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly dated 11/14/07:Motion hearing regarding Plaintiffs' agreed Motion (Doc. No. 50) for extension of time to file response to defendant's motion to compel arbitration and dismiss (Doc. No. 36) is granted. Motion terminated. Plaintiff is to respond to defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss (Doc. No. 36) on or before 12/21/07. Defendants are to reply by 1/11/08. The status hearing presently set for 12/13/07 is to remain in effect.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
November 8, 2007 51 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by James R. Rowe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply 50 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/14/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Rowe, James)
November 8, 2007 50 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo for extension of time to file response/reply (Rowe, James)
November 2, 2007 49 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly :Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held on 11/2/2007 with attorneys for plaintiff and defendant Apple. Defendant indicates that it intends to move for summary judgment. The motion is to be filed by 12/7/2007. No extensions. Status hearing set for 12/13/2007 at 09:30 AM. (or, )
October 24, 2007 48 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly : Status hearing of 10/30/2007 is vacated and reset to 11/2/2007 at 09:00 AM. Hearing on motion to stay is continued to 11/2/2007 at 09:00 AM. (or, )
October 19, 2007 47 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Computer, Inc. by Penelope A. Preovolos; Order entered granting leave by Judge Matthew F. Kennelly. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10341942 (vmj, )
October 19, 2007 46 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Computer, Inc. by Johanna W. Roberts; Order entered granting leave by Judge Matthew F. Kennelly. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10341943 (vmj, )
October 16, 2007 43 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC re declaration 42 of Kevin Ranlett In Support of Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action. (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 42 Featured Case DECLARATION of Kevin Ranlett regarding motion to compel 36 by AT&T Mobility, LLC In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 41 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC re declaration, 40 (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 40 Featured Case DECLARATION of Neil Berinhout regarding motion to compel 36 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 39 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC re declaration 38 (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 38 Featured Case DECLARATION of Richard A. Nagareda regarding motion to compel 36 by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM by AT&T Mobility, LLC in support of motion to compel 36 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 16, 2007 36 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 11, 2007 45 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC by Evan M. Tager; Order entered granted leave by Judge Matthew F. Kennelly. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10650198 (hp, )
October 11, 2007 44 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC by Archis A. Parasharami; Order entered granting leave by Judge Matthew F. Kennelly. Filing fee $50.00 paid, receipt number 10650197 (hp, )
October 10, 2007 35 Featured Case APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC by Kevin S. Ranlett; Order entered granting leave by Judge Matthew F. Kennelly. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10912097 (vmj, )
October 10, 2007 34 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly: The court, having reviewed defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's "term of service," grants AT&T Mobility LLC's motion to stay its obligations under the court's initial standing order 27 pending resolution of its anticipated motion to compel arbitration 29 . This ruling is conditioned upon AT&T Mobility LLC's timely filing of its motion and supporting briefs. Mailed (vmj, )
October 9, 2007 33 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC Re: Terms of Service (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 9, 2007 32 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly :Motion to stay is entered and continued pending submission of arbitration agreement. Plaintiff's motion to preserve is entered and continued to 10/30/2007 at 09:00 AM. Response to motion to compel arbitration is due by 11/16/2007. Reply brief by 11/30/2007. Ruling by mail. (or, )
October 4, 2007 31 Featured Case NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC re MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to stay Amended 29 (Exhibit 2) to Its Obligations Under The Court's Initial Standing Order Pending Resolution of AT&T Mobility LLC's Soon-to-be Filed Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to AT&T Mobility LLC's Amended Motion to Stay, etc.)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 4, 2007 30 Featured Case Amended NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion to stay 29 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 4, 2007 29 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to stay Amended (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Local Rule 37.2 Affidavit)(Reynolds, Sarah)
October 4, 2007 28 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion to stay 27 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 4, 2007 27 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC to stay its obligations under the Court's initial standing order pending resolution of AT&T Mobility LLC's soon-to-be-filed motion to compel arbitration (Reynolds, Sarah)
October 2, 2007 26 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re Response 24 to Apple, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (Drury, Larry)
October 2, 2007 25 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re Response 24 to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (Drury, Larry)
October 2, 2007 24 Featured Case RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses (Drury, Larry)
September 27, 2007 23 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant AT&T Mobility's motion to extend time 13 is granted. Response to complaint is to be filed by 10/16/07. Mailed (vmj, )
September 25, 2007 22 Featured Case AT&T Mobilty's Notification Of Affiliates Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Reynolds, Sarah)
September 24, 2007 21 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Trujillo by James R. Rowe (Rowe, James)
September 24, 2007 20 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. Notification of Affiliates Disclosure Statement (Stanton, Patrick)
September 24, 2007 19 Featured Case NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Apple Computer, Inc. (Stanton, Patrick)
September 24, 2007 18 Featured Case CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Apple Computer, Inc. Answer to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Stanton, Patrick)
September 24, 2007 17 Featured Case Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Apple Computer, Inc.(Stanton, Patrick)
September 24, 2007 16 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Trujillo by James R. Rowe (Rowe, James)
September 24, 2007 15 Featured Case MINUTE entry before Judge Matthew F. Kennelly : Status hearing set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/30/2007 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE/KENNELLY/mfkpage.htm. Counsel for plaintiff (s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (or, )
September 20, 2007 14 Featured Case Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Eileen Reynolds for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 13 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/27/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Reynolds, Sarah)
September 20, 2007 13 Featured Case MOTION by Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint 6 , Unopposed (Reynolds, Sarah)
September 20, 2007 12 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC by Sarah Eileen Reynolds (Reynolds, Sarah)
September 20, 2007 11 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC by Victoria R. Collado (Collado, Victoria)
September 11, 2007 10 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion by Larry Daniel Drury for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 9 , motion to certify class 8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2007 at 09:30 AM. (Drury, Larry)
September 11, 2007 9 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose TrujilloPreservation of Documents (Drury, Larry)
September 11, 2007 8 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Jose Trujillo to certify class (Drury, Larry)
September 6, 2007 7 Featured Case NOTICE by Jose Trujillo re amended complaint 6 , notice of voluntary dismissal 5 (Drury, Larry)
September 6, 2007 6 Featured Case FIRST AMENDED complaint by Jose Trujillo against AT&T Mobility, LLC, Apple Computer, Inc. and terminating AT&T, Inc. (Drury, Larry)
September 6, 2007 5 Featured Case NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Trujillo (Drury, Larry)
September 4, 2007 4 Featured Case ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Trujillo by Larry Daniel Drury (Drury, Larry)
September 4, 2007 Featured Case MAILED Letter re notice of removal and an attorney appearance form to Larry D. Drury (vmj, )
August 31, 2007 2 Featured Case CIVIL Cover Sheet (vmj, )
August 31, 2007 1 Featured Case NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (07 CH 19744) filed by Apple Computer, Inc. with copies of Summons and complaint (vmj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Apple Computer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Trujillo
Represented By: Larry Daniel Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Eileen Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Penelope A. Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?