Illinois Computer Research, LLC v. Fish & Richardson, et al, Featured Case

Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC alleges that defendant Google Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,111,252 entitled "Enhancing Touch and Feel on the Internet."

Plaintiff: Illinois Computer Research, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Scott C Harris
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Case Number: 1:2007cv05081
Filed: September 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2008 Filing 225 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to Stipulation, the above cause is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice and without right of appeal, and with each party to bear its own costs, including attorneys fees, subject to any rights reserved in the Agreement. The court will retain jurisdiction over all matters relating to the Agreement. All pending motions are stricken as moot. Motions #146 , #150 , #164 , #173 , #198 , #201 , #203 , #209 , #214 , and #217 , terminated. Civil case terminated. (ar, )
August 14, 2008 Filing 224 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) (Truax, Terrence)
July 29, 2008 Filing 223 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 7/29/2008. Motion hearing on motions [217, 164, 173, 198, 201, 209] continued to 8/12/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
July 21, 2008 Filing 222 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 7/21/2008. Motion hearing on motions [217, 164, 173, 198, 201, 209] continued to 7/29/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 30, 2008 Filing 221 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Fish & Richardson's motion to compel the return of inadvertently produced privileged documents and withdrawal of discovery based upon them #217 entered and continued to 7/21/2008 at 9:00. By agreement, motions previously continued to 7/9/2008 [164, 173, 198, 201, 209] stricken and reset to 7/21/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 26, 2008 Filing 220 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Motion to compel deposition #209 entered and continued to 7/9/2008 at 9:00; the court anticipates that deponent(s) will be made available within a week after the production of any further discovery responses that may be ordered on 7/9/08. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 26, 2008 Filing 218 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to compel, #217 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/30/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Bradford, David)
June 26, 2008 Filing 217 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel The Return Of Inadvertently Produced Privileged Documents And Withdrawal Of Discovery Based Upon Them (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bradford, David)
June 26, 2008 Filing 216 In Camera Submission To The Court Of Privileged Redactions of Harris Emails by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris (Kenneally, Laura)
June 26, 2008 Filing 215 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for order, #214 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/30/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Bradford, David)
June 26, 2008 Filing 214 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for order reflecting the agreement made in open court on June 23, 2008 (Bradford, David)
June 26, 2008 Filing 213 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 6/23/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: FRANCES WARD (312)435-5561 OR frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 7/17/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2008. (Ward, Frances)
June 25, 2008 Filing 219 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Fish & Richardson's motion to compel production of unredacted versions of certain Harris emails #211 is withdrawn without prejudice. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 24, 2008 Filing 212 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to compel, #211 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/26/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
June 24, 2008 Filing 211 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel Production Of Unredacted Versions Of Certain Harris Emails (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Bradford, David)
June 24, 2008 Filing 210 NOTICE of Motion by Raymond P. Niro for presentment of motion to compel, #209 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/26/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
June 24, 2008 Filing 209 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC to compel Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Niro, Raymond)
June 23, 2008 Filing 207 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Fish & Richardson's motion to compel compliance with the court's May 2, 2008 order #198 and Scott Harris's, ICRs and Third-Party Defendants' joint motion to compel basic discovery from Fish #201 entered and continued to 7/9/2008 at 9:00. Mr. Harris is directed to produce the seven contested documents for the court's in camera inspection. Motion hearing on motions to dismiss [164, 173] set for 7/2/2008 stricken and reset to 7/9/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 20, 2008 Filing 206 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply to response to motion #205 (Bradford, David)
June 20, 2008 Filing 205 REPLY by Fish & Richardson P.C. to Response, #200 (Bradford, David)
June 19, 2008 Filing 208 RESPONSE to Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's May 2, 2008 on December 7, 2007 by Illinois Computer Research, LLC and Scott C Harris. (mb, )
June 19, 2008 Filing 204 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Anne Kenneally for presentment of (Kenneally, Laura)
June 19, 2008 Filing 203 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Kenneally, Laura)
June 19, 2008 Filing 202 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Anne Kenneally for presentment of motion for discovery,,, #201 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/23/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Kenneally, Laura)
June 19, 2008 Filing 201 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris for discovery Scott Harris's, ICR's and Third-Party Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Basic Discovery From Fish (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit K (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit L (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit M (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit N)(Kenneally, Laura)
June 19, 2008 Filing 200 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to motion to compel, #198 Compliance With The Court's May 2, 2008 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (filed under seal), #2 Exhibit B (filed under seal), #3 Exhibit C (filed under seal))(Niro, Raymond)
June 18, 2008 Filing 199 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to compel, #198 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/23/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Bradford, David)
June 18, 2008 Filing 198 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel compliance with the court's May 2, 2008 order (Bradford, David)
June 12, 2008 Filing 197 NOTICE by Laura Anne Kenneally of Change of Address (Kenneally, Laura)
June 10, 2008 Filing 196 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Fish & Richardson's motion for a protective order or, in the alternative, an extension of time #193 is withdrawn. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 10, 2008 Filing 195 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to motion for protective order, #193 Third Party Defendants' Response to Fish's Motion for a Protective Order Or In the Alternative An Extension of Time (Kenneally, Laura)
June 6, 2008 Filing 194 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for protective order, #193 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/11/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
June 6, 2008 Filing 193 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bradford, David)
June 4, 2008 Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/03/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT:Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 6/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (Ward, Frances)
June 4, 2008 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/07/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT:Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 6/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (Ward, Frances)
June 4, 2008 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/08/08 before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 frances_ward@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT:Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Under Quick Links select Electronic Transcript Procedures. Redaction Request due 6/25/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (Ward, Frances)
June 4, 2008 Filing 189 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply #188 (Bradford, David)
June 4, 2008 Filing 188 REPLY by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to Response, #187 (Bradford, David)
June 3, 2008 Filing 187 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to Fish & Richardson's Submission of Documents For In Camera Review (Niro, Raymond)
June 3, 2008 Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: ICR's motion to strike Fish's memorandum in support of its motion to dismiss #180 is denied, but the court will not use the expression "shell" entities. Mailed notice (etv, )
June 2, 2008 Filing 185 Fish & Richardson's Request For The Court To Take Judicial Notice (Bradford, David)
June 2, 2008 Filing 184 MEMORANDUM by Illinois Computer Research, LLC in support of motion to strike,, motion for relief, #180 Memorandum in Support of ICR's Motion to Strike Or, In The Alternative, To Require Fish to Re-File All Such Pleadings Without Reference to Pejorative Terms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Niro, Raymond)
June 2, 2008 Filing 183 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion,, #182 (Bradford, David)
June 2, 2008 Filing 182 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Illinois Computer Research, LLC to strike memorandum in support of motion #174 To Dismiss, AndMOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Illinois Computer Research, LLC to strike memorandum in support of motion #174 To Dismiss, And #180 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, David)
May 30, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE of Motion by Raymond P. Niro for presentment of motion to strike,, motion for relief, #180 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/3/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Niro, Raymond)
May 30, 2008 Filing 180 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Illinois Computer Research, LLC to strike memorandum in support of motion #174 To Dismiss, And To Strike All Other Pleadings That Make Reference To "Shell Entities" Or, In The Alternative, To Require Fish To Re-File All Such Pleadings Without Reference To Pejorative Terms (Niro, Raymond)
May 29, 2008 Filing 179 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Fish & Richardson's motion to dismiss Mr. Harris's and the Shell Entities' counterclaims #173 entered and continued to 7/2/208 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 27, 2008 Filing 176 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Unopposed motion to withdraw Karen L. Blouin as counsel for Illinois Computer Research, LLC and Scott C. Harris #171 granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
May 27, 2008 Filing 175 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to dismiss, #173 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/29/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
May 27, 2008 Filing 174 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion to dismiss, #173 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bradford, David)
May 27, 2008 Filing 173 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to dismiss Mr. Harris's and the Shell Entities' Counterclaims (Bradford, David)
May 23, 2008 Filing 178 SUR-REPLY in Support of their Motion to Compel by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. (mb, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 177 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendants motion for leave to file a sur-reply (169) is granted. Plaintiffs motion to remove and refile Exhibit A (152) is granted. Plaintiffs motion to compel (146) entered and continued pending in camera review of the challenged documents; Defendant agrees to produce those documents for the courts review by Wednesday, May 28, 2008. Discovery close date of September 30, 2008 stands, but the date for Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures is extended to August 15, 2008 for initial expert disclosure; date for Rule 26(a)(2) disclosure for responsive experts is extended to September 15, 2008. Date for filing amended pleadings is extended to June 30, 2008. Mailed notice (mb, )
May 23, 2008 Filing 172 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Anne Kenneally for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #171 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/29/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Kenneally, Laura)
May 23, 2008 Filing 171 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to withdraw as attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Karen L. Blouin As Counsel for Illinois Computer Research, LLC and Scott C. Harris (Kenneally, Laura)
May 22, 2008 Filing 170 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for leave to file #169 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/23/2008 at 02:00 PM. (Bradford, David)
May 22, 2008 Filing 169 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for leave to file a Sur-Reply to Mr. Harris's and ICR's Reply in Support of Their Motion to Compel Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, David)
May 21, 2008 Filing 168 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held. Baxter Research, LLC's motion to dismiss Fish & Richardson's Amended Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) for lack of personal jurisdiction #164 is entered and continued to 7/2/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 19, 2008 Filing 167 REPLY by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, and Scott Harris in support of its motion compel documents #146 . (Kenneally, Laura). (Text edited by Clerk's Office). Modified on 5/21/2008 (ar, ).
May 15, 2008 Filing 166 RE- NOTICE of Motion by Laura Anne Kenneally for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #164 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/21/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Kenneally, Laura)
May 13, 2008 Filing 165 NOTICE of Motion by Laura Anne Kenneally for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #164 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/19/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Kenneally, Laura)
May 13, 2008 Filing 164 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Scott C Harris, Counter Defendants Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Kenneally, Laura)
May 13, 2008 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM BARTEX RESEARCH, LLC'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FISH & RICHARDSON'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(2) FOR LACK OF JURSIDICTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kenneally, Laura)
May 12, 2008 Filing 162 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended COUNTERCLAIM filed by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris against Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris and Counterclaims against Fish & Richardson. by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris(Vickrey, Paul)
May 12, 2008 Filing 161 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion, #160 (Bradford, David)
May 12, 2008 Filing 160 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to compel Documents Improperly Withheld On The Grounds Of Attorney-Client Pr #146 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bradford, David)
May 7, 2008 Filing 159 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Scott Harris and ICR's motion for reconsideration of the ruling dismissing the tortious interference claims(s) without prejudice #156 denied without prejudice to an amended pleading. Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson's motion for attorneys' fees #52 is stricken without prejudice. Date for filing amended pleadings extended to 5/30/2008. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 5, 2008 Filing 157 Scott Harris and ICR's NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #156 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/7/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Vickrey, Paul)
May 5, 2008 Filing 156 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for reconsideration of the Ruling Dismissing the Tortious Interference Claim(s) without Prejudice (Vickrey, Paul)
May 2, 2008 Filing 158 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Oral arguments heard. Motion for judgment on the pleadings [49, 52] granted without prejudice with respect to the tortious interference claim and denied with respect to the Mr. Harris's defamation claim. Plaintiffs have leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days. Plaintiff ICR and Harriss motion for protective order #72 is withdrawn with respect to Fee Agreements, granted with respect to Mr. Harris's communications concerning potential disputes between himself and Fish & Richardson; and otherwise denied without prejudice to in camera review of any documents that are strictly of a personal (non-professional) nature (i.e., references to medical treatments). Plaintiff's motions to compel and for leave to file certain materials under seal [146, 148, 150, 152] entered and continued for briefing: response 5/12/2008; reply 5/19/2008; ruling set for 5/23/2008 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (etv, )
May 1, 2008 Filing 155 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion, #154 (Bradford, David)
May 1, 2008 Filing 154 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to compel Documents Improperly Withheld On The Grounds Of Attorney-Client Pr #146 (Preliminary Response) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bradford, David)
May 1, 2008 Filing 153 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #152 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/2/2008 at 03:00 PM. (Vickrey, Paul)
May 1, 2008 Filing 152 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris To Remove Exhibit A From The Docket and For Leave to Refile Exhibit A Under Seal (Attachments: # 1 Removed per court order dated 5/23/08)(Vickrey, Paul) (mb, ).
May 1, 2008 Filing 151 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris by Laura Anne Kenneally (Kenneally, Laura)
April 30, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to seal document notice of motion #149 , memorandum in support of motion, #145 (Vickrey, Paul)
April 30, 2008 Filing 149 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion to seal document, motion for relief #148 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/2/2008 at 03:00 PM. (Vickrey, Paul)
April 30, 2008 Filing 148 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to seal document memorandum in support of motion, #145 (Vickrey, Paul)
April 30, 2008 Filing 147 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion to compel, #146 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/2/2008 at 03:00 PM. (Vickrey, Paul)
April 30, 2008 Filing 146 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to compel Documents Improperly Withheld On The Grounds Of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work-Product Immunity (Vickrey, Paul)
April 30, 2008 Filing 145 MEMORANDUM ICR and Scott Harris' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Documents Improperly Withheld On The Grounds Of Attorney-Client Privilege and Work-Product Immunity [REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal)(Vickrey, Paul)
April 28, 2008 Filing 144 WITHDRAWAL of Privilege Claim and Supplemental Response to Fish & Richardson's Opposition to Claim of Privilege as to Documents Produced Inadvertently by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
April 28, 2008 Filing 143 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #137 granted. Oral argument set for 5/2/2008 at 3:00 PM. Mailed notice (etv, )
April 28, 2008 Filing 142 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to Response #134 To Fish & Richardson's Opposition to Claim of Privilege as to Documents Produced Inadvertently (Supplemental) and Harris and ICR's Withdrawal of Privilege Claim (Redacted, Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Niro, Raymond)
April 25, 2008 Filing 141 REPLY by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for leave to file Under Seal #137 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Megley, Richard)
April 24, 2008 Filing 140 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion, #139 (Bradford, David)
April 24, 2008 Filing 139 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for leave to file Under Seal #137 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bradford, David)
April 23, 2008 Filing 138 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Burns Megley, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file #137 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/28/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Megley, Richard)
April 23, 2008 Filing 137 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for leave to file Under Seal (Megley, Richard)
April 18, 2008 Filing 136 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply, #135 (Bradford, David)
April 18, 2008 Filing 135 REPLY by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. To Mr. Harris And ICR'S April 17, 2008 Revision Of Privilege Claims As To Documents Allegedly Produced Inadvertently (Bradford, David)
April 17, 2008 Filing 134 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC to other, #132 Fish's Opposition to Harris' and ICR's Claim of Privilege (Blouin, Karen)
April 9, 2008 Filing 133 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re other, #132 (Bradford, David)
April 9, 2008 Filing 132 Fish & Richardson's Opposition to Harris's and ICR's Claim of Privilege as to Documents Allegedly Produced Inadvertently and Submitted Under Seal in Open Court on March 31, 2008. by Fish & Richardson P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Bradford, David)
April 8, 2008 Filing 131 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Ruling held. Fish & Richardsons motion for leave to file an amended counterclaim and third-party complaint #99 granted. Date to add additional parties and to amend pleadings extended to 5/21/2008. Status hearing set for 5/21/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (mb, )
March 31, 2008 Filing 130 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:Motion hearing held. Fish & Richardson P.C.'s motion for leave to file instanter a supplemental brief in support of its renewed motion to compel #125 is withdrawn. Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions is withdrawn. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 30, 2008 Filing 129 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re other #128 (Bradford, David)
March 30, 2008 Filing 128 Fish & Richardson P.C.'s Opposition to Scott Harris's and ICR's Combined Motion for Sanctions (127). by Fish & Richardson P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bradford, David)
March 28, 2008 Filing 127 RESPONSE by Illinois Computer Research, LLC to MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to file instanter a supplemental brief in support of its renewed motion to com #125 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blouin, Karen)
March 27, 2008 Filing 126 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to file instanter, #125 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/31/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
March 27, 2008 Filing 125 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to file instanter a supplemental brief in support of its renewed motion to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Supplemental Brief))(Bradford, David)
March 24, 2008 Filing 124 MINUTE entry before Judge Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:As Defendants' response makes clear that there has not been a conference pursuant to Rule 37, Scott Harris's and ICR's motion to compel depositions of Fish witnesses in Chicago, Illinois #120 is denied without prejudice. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 21, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion, #122 (Bradford, David)
March 21, 2008 Filing 122 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC to compel DEPOSITIONS OF FISH WITNESSES IN CHICAGO, ILLINOIS #120 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bradford, David)
March 18, 2008 Filing 121 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion to compel #120 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/24/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Vickrey, Paul)
March 18, 2008 Filing 120 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC to compel DEPOSITIONS OF FISH WITNESSES IN CHICAGO, ILLINOIS (Vickrey, Paul)
March 17, 2008 Filing 119 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply to response to motion #118 (Bradford, David)
March 17, 2008 Filing 118 REPLY by Fish & Richardson P.C. to Response #117 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bradford, David)
March 10, 2008 Filing 116 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply to response to motion #115 (Bradford, David)
March 10, 2008 Filing 115 REPLY by Fish & Richardson P.C. to memorandum in opposition to motion #102 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, David)
March 7, 2008 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition to Fish & Richardson's Renewed Motion to Compel by Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC (mb, )
March 4, 2008 Filing 114 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Motion hearing held. Scott Harris's and ICS's motion to proceed with discovery #103 granted. If proceeding with depositions at this point is premature, and depositions must be reopened following the naming of additional parties, Plaintiff's counsel will be required to pay the cost for the reopened depositions. Fish & Richardson P.C.'s renewed motion to compel production of documents #105 granted in part and denied in part without prejudice by agreement. Date for filing of Defendant's reply in support of motion for leave to amend #99 extended to 3/10/2008. Ruling date of 3/17/2008 stricken and reset to 4/8/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
March 3, 2008 Filing 113 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply to response to motion, #112 (Bradford, David)
March 3, 2008 Filing 112 REPLY by Fish & Richardson P.C. to MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel Production Of Documents (Renewed) #105 (Bradford, David)
March 3, 2008 Filing 111 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re response in opposition to motion, #110 (Bradford, David)
March 3, 2008 Filing 110 RESPONSE by Fish & Richardson P.C.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for discovery #103 (Bradford, David)
March 3, 2008 Filing 109 RESPONSE by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris to MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel Production Of Documents (Renewed) #105 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Vickrey, Paul)
February 29, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to compel #105 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/4/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
February 29, 2008 Filing 107 Local Rule 37.2 STATEMENT by Fish & Richardson P.C. (Bradford, David)
February 29, 2008 Filing 106 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion to compel #105 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J)(Bradford, David)
February 29, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel Production Of Documents (Renewed) (Bradford, David)
February 28, 2008 Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion for discovery #103 (Vickrey, Paul)
February 28, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vickrey, Paul)
February 28, 2008 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris in Opposition to motion for leave to file, #99 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F)(Vickrey, Paul)
February 14, 2008 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing held on 2/14/2008. Fish & Richardson's motion for leave to file an amended counterclaim and third-party complaint entered for briefing as follows: Response 2/28/2008; reply 3/6/2008; ruling set for 3/17/2008 at 9:00. Time to add additional parties extended to 4/30/2008. By agreement, all discovery is stayed, save for the discovery requests already served. To the extent any party believes responses are inadequate, the court expects compliance with Rule 37 prior to any motion to compel. Mailed notice (etv, )
February 12, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for leave to file, #99 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/14/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Bradford, David)
February 12, 2008 Filing 99 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for leave to file An Amended Counterclaim And Third-Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bradford, David)
February 1, 2008 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Settlement conference convened. Settlement was not reached. Status hearing set for 2/5/2008 is stricken and reset to 2/14/2008 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Fish & Richardson's motion for leave to file its reply brief in support of its motion for judgment on the pleadings, instanter, in excess of 15 pages #95 granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
January 22, 2008 Filing 96 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for leave to file,, #95 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/24/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
January 22, 2008 Filing 95 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for leave to file Instanter A Brief In Excess Of 15 Pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Combined Reply Memorandum In Support Of Fish & Richardson's Rule 12(C) Motions Against ICR And Harris#2 Exhibit A#3 Exhibit B#4 Exhibit C#5 Exhibit D#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J#12 Exhibit K)(Bradford, David)
January 15, 2008 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :By agreement, settlement conference set for 2/1/2008 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' agreed motion briefing schedule #89 granted. Fish & Richardson are granted leave to file their response on or before 1/22/08. Mailed notice (mb, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Scott Harris' unopposed motion for leave to file a reply in support of his motion for protective order #87 is granted. Reply to be filed on or before 1/14/2008. Mailed notice (mb, )
January 14, 2008 Filing 91 REPLY by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to memorandum in opposition to motion, #84 (Vickrey, Paul)
January 9, 2008 Filing 90 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #89 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/14/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
January 9, 2008 Filing 89 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to set a briefing schedule (Agreed) (Bradford, David)
January 9, 2008 Filing 88 NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of motion for leave to file, #87 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/14/2008 at 08:45 AM. (Vickrey, Paul)
January 9, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for leave to file a reply in support of his motion for protective order (Vickrey, Paul)
January 8, 2008 Filing 85 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re memorandum in opposition to motion, #84 (Bradford, David)
January 8, 2008 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in Opposition to motion for protective order, #72 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 1(redacted), 2(redacted), 3(redacted)#2 Exhibit B(redacted)#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H(redacted)#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P)(Bradford, David)
January 7, 2008 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion for leave to file oversized brief and for leave to file certain exhibits under seal instanter #81 is granted. Mailed notice (mb, )
January 3, 2008 Filing 83 EXHIBITS D and E to Combined Response of ICR and Scott Harris to Fish's Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC and Scott C. Harris (RESTRICTED)(mb, )
January 3, 2008 Filing 82 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to memorandum in support of motion #50 , memorandum in support of motion #53 for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Vickrey, Paul)
January 3, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for leave to file excess pages and for leave to file exhibits under seal (Vickrey, Paul)
December 21, 2007 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Discovery conference convened. Motion to compel #61 granted in part and denied in part. Mr. Harriss cross motion to compel #69 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs motion for a protective order regarding privileged e-mail #72 entered and continued for further response on 1/8/2008. Date for Plaintiffs response to Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings #49 extended to 1/3/2008. Parties to advise the court no later than 1/3/2008 of a proposed protocol for mediation of this dispute. Mailed notice (mb, )
December 20, 2007 Filing 79 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply, #78 (Bradford, David)
December 20, 2007 Filing 78 REPLY by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to Response, #69 , motion to compel #61 (In Support) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K)(Bradford, David)
December 20, 2007 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Motion hearing held. Scott Harris's motion for clarification #71 granted by agreement, and Scott Harris' motion for a protective order regarding privileged e-mail #72 entered and continued to 12/21/2007 at 9:00. Apart from those messages already seen by Defendants, the court directs that, pending tomorrow's hearing, there be no further review of Scott Harris's e-mail. Mailed notice (etv, )
December 20, 2007 Filing 75 REPLY by Counter Claimant Scott C Harris in Support of his Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Privileged E-Mail (Niro, Raymond)
December 19, 2007 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in Opposition to motion for protective order, #72 (Preliminary) (Bradford, David)
December 18, 2007 Filing 73 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Minute Order of 12/13/2007 is amended to reflect that reply in support of motion to compel #61 is due 12/20/2007; ruling set for 12/21/2007 at 9:00. Ruling set for 1/22/2008 is stricken. Mailed notice (mb, )
December 18, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Vickrey, Paul)
December 18, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to clarify (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Vickrey, Paul)
December 18, 2007 Filing 70 Motion for Clarification and Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Privileged E-Mail NOTICE of Motion by Paul K. Vickrey for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/20/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Vickrey, Paul)
December 18, 2007 Filing 69 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to motion to compel #61 and Cross Motion to Compel Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H)(Vickrey, Paul)
December 18, 2007 Filing 68 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Fish & Richardson P.C. (Sacks, Eric)
December 17, 2007 Filing 76 EXHIBIT H to Scott Harris' (1) Response to Fish's Motion to Compel, and (2) Cross Motion to Compel Discovery. (RESTRICTED) (mb, )
December 13, 2007 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Fish & Richardson P.C.s motion to compel discovery and compliance with the courts order #61 entered and continued for briefing. Response due 12/18/2007; reply 1/20/2008; ruling set for 1/22/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (mb, )
December 12, 2007 Filing 66 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Defendant Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris to memorandum in support of motion, #62 , notice of motion #63 ICR's and Scott Harris' Preliminary Response to Fish & Richardson P.C.'s Motion to Compel Discovery and Compliance with the Court's Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheikh, David)
December 11, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion to compel #61 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/13/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
December 11, 2007 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion to compel #61 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J#11 Exhibit K#12 Exhibit L#13 Exhibit M#14 Exhibit N#15 Exhibit O#16 Exhibit P#17 Exhibit Q#18 Exhibit R)(Bradford, David)
December 11, 2007 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to compel Discovery and Compliance with the Court's Order (Bradford, David)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE Order Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/7/2007.(mb, )
December 7, 2007 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Agreed motion to enter stipulated protective order #59 is granted. Enter Stipulated Protective Order. Mailed notice (mb, )
December 6, 2007 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for protective order #59 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 12/11/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
December 6, 2007 Filing 59 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for protective order (Agreed Stipulated) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacks, Eric)
December 3, 2007 Filing 58 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Rule 16 conference convened. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures to be made by 12/14/2007. All discovery to be completed by 9/30/2008. Retained expert reports under Rule 26(a)(2): For all issues on which a party bears the burden of proof by 6/30/2008; rebuttal reports by 8/15/2008. Parties allowed to join additional parties and to amend pleadings by 3/31/2008. Parties have leave to take up to 15 depositions per side without further leave of court. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2008. ICR and Harris to prepare proposed PTO draft by 1/30/2008; Joint Final Pretrial Order by 2/27/2009. Status hearing set for 2/5/2008 at 9:00. Mailed notice (etv, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/28/2007.(mb, )
November 28, 2007 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : It is hereby ordered: That Scott C. Harris and Illinois Computer Research, LLC shall file their respective responses to the Rule 12(c) motions [49, 52] on or before 12/28/07, and it is further ordered that Fish & Richardson P.C. shall file its reply briefs in suport of its Rule 12(c) motions on or before 1/16/08. Enter Agreed Order. Mailed notice (mb, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the Court's own motion, Rule 16 Conference set for 11/26/2007 is reset to 12/3/2007 at 9:00 A.M. by agreement of the parties. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
November 21, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings, motion for attorney fees #52 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/28/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings, motion for attorney fees #52 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H)(Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 52 MOTION by Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for judgment on the pleadings, MOTION by Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for attorney fees (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings #49 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/28/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings #49 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for judgment on the pleadings Against ICR (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re reply #47 (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 47 REPLY by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to counterclaim #27 (Bradford, David)
November 21, 2007 Filing 46 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Fish & Richardson P.C., Scott C Harris (Bradford, David)
November 20, 2007 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 11/20/2007. Fish & Richardson P.C.s motion for limited expedited discovery #40 granted as stated in open court; obligation to proceed with expedited discovery for critical documents is mutual; both parties will produce within fourteen (14) days documents requested that are appropriate for expedited discovery. Mailed notice (mb, )
November 19, 2007 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harrisin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for discovery (Limited Expedited) #40 (Vickrey, Paul)
November 19, 2007 Filing 43 Of Efforts To Reach An Accord STATEMENT by Fish & Richardson P.C. (Bradford, David)
November 19, 2007 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Fish & Richardson P.C. in support of motion for discovery #40 (Bradford, David)
November 19, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE of Motion by David J. Bradford for presentment of motion for discovery #40 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/21/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Bradford, David)
November 19, 2007 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. for discovery (Limited Expedited) (Bradford, David)
November 19, 2007 Filing 39 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Fish & Richardson P.C., Scott C Harris (Sheikh, David)
November 7, 2007 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fish & Richardson P.C. as to Scott C Harris on 10/30/2007, answer due 11/19/2007. (Weiss, Daniel)
November 6, 2007 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff, Illinois Computer Research, LLC, hereby voluntarily dismisses, with prejudice, only those claims made by ICR against Defendant, Google, Inc. Case remains pending as to all remaining claims and counterclaims. Mailed notice (mb, )
November 6, 2007 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris by David J. Sheikh (Sheikh, David)
November 5, 2007 Filing 35 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re amended answer to complaint #33 (Weiss, Daniel)
November 5, 2007 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. by Terrence Joseph Truax (Truax, Terrence)
November 5, 2007 Filing 33 AMENDED Answer by Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. to ICR's amended complaint #16 (Weiss, Daniel)
November 5, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (Niro, Raymond)
October 31, 2007 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris by Richard Burns Megley, Jr (Megley, Richard)
October 31, 2007 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris by Raymond P. Niro (Niro, Raymond)
October 31, 2007 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris, Counter Claimant Scott C Harris by Paul K. Vickrey (Vickrey, Paul)
October 31, 2007 Filing 28 ANSWER to counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint of Fish & Richardson by Illinois Computer Research, LLC, Scott C Harris(Vickrey, Paul)
October 31, 2007 Filing 27 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Scott C Harris against Fish & Richardson P.C..(Niro, Raymond)
October 26, 2007 Filing 26 SUMMONS Issued as to Third Party Defendant Scott C Harris (mb, )
October 16, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re counterclaim, third party complaint #21 Notice of Filing / Certificate of Service (Weiss, Daniel)
October 16, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE by Fish & Richardson P.C. re answer to amended complaint #20 Notice of Filing / Certificate of Service (Weiss, Daniel)
October 16, 2007 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C. by Daniel J. Weiss (Weiss, Daniel)
October 16, 2007 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C., Counter Claimant Fish & Richardson P.C., ThirdParty Plaintiff Fish & Richardson P.C. by Eric Andrew Sacks (Sacks, Eric)
October 16, 2007 Filing 21 COUNTERCLAIM filed by Fish & Richardson P.C. against Illinois Computer Research, LLC., THIRD party complaint by Fish & Richardson P.C. against Scott C Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradford, David)
October 16, 2007 Filing 20 ANSWER to amended complaint by Fish & Richardson P.C.(Bradford, David)
October 16, 2007 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. by David J. Bradford (Bradford, David)
October 9, 2007 Filing 18 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fish & Richardson P.C. (kw, )
October 9, 2007 Filing 17 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Google Inc. c/o Illinois Coporation Service (kw, )
October 5, 2007 Filing 16 AMENDED complaint by Illinois Computer Research, LLC against Google Inc. and Fish & Richardson P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Vickrey, Paul)
October 5, 2007 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC by Paul K. Vickrey (Vickrey, Paul)
September 27, 2007 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint #12 is granted to and including 11/15/2007. No appearance is necessary on 10/2/2007. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. on 11/26/2007 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
September 26, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Burns Megley, Jr for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 10/2/2007 at 08:45 AM. (Megley, Richard)
September 26, 2007 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC for extension of time For Google to Answer (Agreed) (Megley, Richard)
September 19, 2007 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illinois Computer Research, LLC as to Google Inc. on 9/12/2007, answer due 10/2/2007. (mb, )
September 12, 2007 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Status hearing set for 11/20/2007 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2119. Mailed notice (etv, )
September 11, 2007 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Google Inc. (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 7 LOCAL RULE 3.2 Notice as to Affiliates - Disclosure Statement by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 6 LOCAL RULE 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patent by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC by Richard Burns Megley, Jr (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC by Karen L. Blouin (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Computer Research, LLC by Raymond P. Niro (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (Exhibits); Jury Demand.(mb, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Illinois Computer Research, LLC (Exhibits); Jury Demand.(mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Computer Research, LLC v. Fish & Richardson, et al,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Computer Research, LLC
Represented By: Karen L. Blouin
Represented By: Paul K Vickrey
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Represented By: Richard Burns Megley, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Anne Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott C Harris
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Represented By: Paul K Vickrey
Represented By: Richard Burns Megley, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Anne Kenneally
Represented By: David J. Sheikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Fish & Richardson P.C.
Represented By: Eric Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Daniel J. Weiss
Represented By: David J. Bradford
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?