CE Design Ltd. v. Sadegi

Plaintiff: CE Design Ltd.
Defendant: Cy Sadegi
Case Number: 1:2007cv05456
Filed: September 27, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 435 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/1/2011. (mk)
August 23, 2010 330 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/23/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )
July 27, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/27/2009: Mailed notice(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CE Design Ltd. v. Sadegi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CE Design Ltd.
Represented By: Brian J Wanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cy Sadegi
Represented By: Eric L. Samore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?