Robinson et al v. McNeil Consumer & Specialty Pharmaceuticals et al

Plaintiff: Karen Robinson and Jonathon Robinson
Defendant: McNeil Consumer & Specialty Pharmaceuticals and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2007cv05603
Filed: October 3, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 456 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/16/2009: Mailed notice (am)
September 16, 2009 424 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiffs Karen Robinson, Jonathon Robinson to amend/correct order on motion for judgment,, order on motion to withdraw,, terminated case, jury trial - completed,,,,,,,,,,,, 420 , entered judgment 421 , MOTION by Plaintiffs Karen Robinson, Jonathon Robinson for judgment, MOTION by Plaintiffs Karen Robinson, Jonathon Robinson for new trial [PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, MOTION TO AMEND THE JUDGMENT, AND MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL] (Simon, Dana)
August 28, 2009 411 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiffs Karen Robinson, Jonathon Robinson for judgment [PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW] (Simon, Dana)
August 27, 2009 407 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, McNeil Consumer Healthcare for judgment [Renewed] Motion for Judgement as a Matter of Law (Sudzus, David)
August 26, 2009 405 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, McNeil Consumer Healthcare for judgment as a Matter of Law (Sudzus, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. McNeil Consumer & Specialty Pharmaceuticals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Robinson
Represented By: John Devitt Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Robinson
Represented By: John Devitt Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil Consumer & Specialty Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: David B. Sudzus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Sudzus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?