Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd. et al v. CMT International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd. and "K" Line America, Inc.
Defendant: Plano Molding Co. and CMT International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2007cv05675
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 247 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/6/2014:Mailed notice(wp, )
December 30, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/30/2013. Mailed notice (mgh, )
October 11, 2013 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/11/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )
July 19, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court finds that Plano is bound as a party to the World Bill of Lading and may be held liable to Plaintiffs; Denies Plano's objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibits 2, 9, 18, 20, 21 and 88; Denies the Plain tiffs' objections to Plano's Exhibits 1, 3, and 4; and Sustains the Plaintiff's objections to Plano's Exhibits 2 and 5. Status hearing set for 7/25/2013 to set a trial date on the issues of causation and damages. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/19/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )
July 27, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/27/2011:Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd. et al v. CMT International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawasaki Kisen Kaisha, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: "K" Line America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lee Reeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plano Molding Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMT International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?