Lyssenko v. International Titanium Powder, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Taras Lyssenko
Defendant: International Titanium Powder, LLC and Stanley Borys
Case Number: 1:2007cv06678
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2010 250 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 12/17/2010:Mailed notice(keg, )
July 23, 2010 212 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/23/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
October 20, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/20/2008. (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyssenko v. International Titanium Powder, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taras Lyssenko
Represented By: Gia Fonte Colunga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Titanium Powder, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Borys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?