Dominguez v. Austin et al

Petitioner: Ramon Dominguez
Respondent: Dan Austin and Lisa Madigan
Case Number: 1:2007cv07065
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Virginia M. Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/27/2012:The Court denies Dominguezs current redundant Motion. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/27/2012.Mailed notice(tsa, )
April 8, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011:The Court previously denied Dominguezs earlier Rule 60(b) motion for reconsideration. (R. 43.) The present motion presents no new meritorious legal arguments and, as such, is also denied. Entered by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2011.Mailed notice(tsa, )
January 7, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Petitioner Ramon Dominguez for relief from judgment. (vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Dominguez
Represented By: Jed H. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lisa Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?