Gribben et al v. City of Summit et al

Plaintiff: Corey Gribben
Defendant: City of Summit, Officer Flinchum and Officer Maze
Case Number: 1:2008cv00123
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Samuel Der-Yeghiayan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 3/23/2011: For the reasons explained below, the defendant's Bill of Costs 79 is allowed, as modified in this order. (For further details see written opinion). Mailed notice.(et, )
January 26, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order entered by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 1/26/2011.(vmj, )
July 20, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 7/20/2010.(jj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gribben et al v. City of Summit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Gribben
Represented By: Carol L. Oshana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Summit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Flinchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?