LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. v. Whirlpool Corporation

Plaintiff: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv00242
Filed: January 10, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 706 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/20/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
August 10, 2011 693 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/10/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
June 6, 2011 683 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation for judgment As A Matter of Law On The Illinois Uniforn Deceptive Trade Practices Act Claim (Roche, Brian)
May 9, 2011 675 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/9/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 27, 2010 568 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/27/2010: LG's motion in limine to exclude references to Whirlpool's conspiracy theory about the origins of consumer perceptions of the Whirlpool dryer 447 is granted in part and denied in part. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
September 22, 2010 551 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/22/2010: Whirlpool's motion in limine to preclude LG Electronics from introducing improper expert testimony and documents regarding wrinkle testing 441 is granted in part and granted in part without prejudice. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
September 14, 2010 545 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/14/2010: Whirlpool's Motion in Limine to Exclude Trial Testimony Not Previously Disclosed During 30(b)(6)Depositions 464 465 is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
September 13, 2010 543 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/13/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 3, 2010 509 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/3/2010: Plaintiff's motion to exclude the expert testimony and strike the expert reports and opinions of Dr. Subbaiah Malladi 375 is granted in part and denied in part. [For further details see minute order.]Mailed notice(kef, )
September 1, 2010 505 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/1/2010: Whirlpool's Motion in Limine to Limit Count IV of LG's Second Amended Complaint 457 is granted. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 24, 2010 470 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/24/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )
July 22, 2010 417 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/22/2010: Plaintiff's motion to exclude survey evidence and the expert report of Whirlpool's expert Dr. Ravi Dhar 377 is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
October 13, 2009 333 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/13/2009:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 28, 2009 324 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/28/2009:Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?