Searcy v. eFunds Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Gladys Searcy
Defendant: eFunds Corporation and Deposit Payment Protection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00985
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2011 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/16/2011.Mailed notice(sct, )
December 14, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/14/2010: We grant Defendants' motion (Doc 300 ) for interlocutory appeal, and certify the question of whether an electronic list of drivers' license numbers and bank account numbers associated with individuals who have presented bad checks or had bank accounts closed adversely constitutes a "consumer report" under 15 U.S.C. § 1681g. The CDIA's motion (Doc 319 ) to file their memorandum is denied as moot. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
September 30, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/30/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )
July 22, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order to Strike Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents 243 is granted in part and denied in part; WRITTEN Opinion. Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (is, )
March 31, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/31/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )
January 20, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/20/2010.Mailed notice(sct, )
March 5, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/5/2009.Mailed notice(sct, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searcy v. eFunds Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Searcy
Represented By: Edward H. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eFunds Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deposit Payment Protection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?