Itex, Inc. et al v. Workrite Uniform Company Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Itex, Inc. and MF & H Textiles, Inc.
Defendant: Workrite Uniform Company Inc., Bulwark, Cintas, Unifirst, G & K Services, Aramark, Greenwood Mills, Inc., Mount Vernon Mills Inc. and CarHartt, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv01224
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Referring Judge: Morton Denlow
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 252 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/20/2011: Mailed notice(etv, )
March 31, 2011 209 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/31/2011: The motion of Defendants Mount Vernon and VF Imagewear to compel answers to their requests for admission 194 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs are ordered to comply with this order by April 8, 2011. The status hearing will proceed as scheduled on April 7, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1003. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
March 9, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 3/9/2011. (aac, )
September 9, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 9/9/2010. (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itex, Inc. et al v. Workrite Uniform Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itex, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Warren Hetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MF & H Textiles, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Warren Hetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Workrite Uniform Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bulwark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cintas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & K Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Vernon Mills Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CarHartt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?