Capeheart v. Northeastern Illinois University et al

Plaintiff: Loretta Capeheart
Defendant: Northeastern Illinois University and Melvin C. Terrell
Case Number: 1:2008cv01423
Filed: March 10, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Referring Judge: Sidney I. Schenkier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 244 Opinion or Order of the Court The defendants' motion for reconsideration [242-1] is granted and the court's order dated June 9, 2011, [239-1] is vacated. The plaintiff's motion for a stay without the requirements of a supersedeas bond 2361 is denied. To obtain a stay, Capeheart must post the bond required under Rule 62(d). WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 6/14/2011: Mailed notice(rth, )
May 12, 2011 235 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 5/12/2011: The defendants' bill of costs is granted in part and denied in part as follows: costs are awarded in the amount of $3,933.56.Mailed notice(rth, )
February 14, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 2/14/2011:Mailed notice(rth, )
March 9, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 3/9/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
October 21, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/21/2008:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capeheart v. Northeastern Illinois University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Capeheart
Represented By: Thomas D. Rosenwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeastern Illinois University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin C. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?