Wheeler v. Walker et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Wheeler
Defendant: Roger E. Walker, Mays, Butkiewizc, Lifter, Mc Dowell, Young, G Moore and Terry Mc Cann
Case Number: 1:2008cv01637
Filed: March 26, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights (Prison Condition) Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 12/23/2010: Plaintiff's motion (Doc 160 ) for a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum ordering that certain incarcerated witnesses be produced by the state is denied without prejudi ce. Plaintiff's motion (Doc 161 ) to reassign this matter to a United States Magistrate Judge is denied as all parties do not consent to the reassignment. Plaintiff's motion (Doc 166 ) for an interlocutory appeal of our order denying hi s motion for appointment of counsel is denied. However, the Court hereby appoints Monika Jeetu Machen of SNR Denton US LLP, 233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7800, Chicago, IL 60606, (312)876-8000, (mmachen@sonnenschein.com), as counsel for plainti ff for purposes of his upcoming trial. We grant plaintiff's motion (Doc 165 ) for an extension of time to file the pretrial order, and provide an additional 60 days, or to 3/1/2011 for the submission of the Final Pretrial Order. Plaintiff's last two motions for additional time in the law library (Doc 158 ) and to meet with defendants prior to the submission of the pretrial order (Doc 159 ) are denied as moot. (For further details see minute order.)Mailed notice(sct, )
December 7, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Wheeler for judgment by default (Exhibits); Notice. (td, )
April 27, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Wheeler for a judgment by default against defendant G. Moore. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butkiewizc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mc Dowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Mc Cann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?