Lizak v. Great Masonry, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bogdan Lizak
Defendant: Great Masonry, Inc. and Krzysztof Mendys
Case Number: 1:2008cv01930
Filed: April 2, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 7/29/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )
September 22, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 9/22/2009. (kjd, )
March 30, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 3/30/2009.(kjd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lizak v. Great Masonry, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogdan Lizak
Represented By: LaKisha Michelle Kinsey-Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzysztof Mendys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?