Maldonado v. Chicago Police Officers et al

Plaintiff: Miguel Maldonado
Defendant: Chicago Police Officers and City of Chicago, The
Case Number: 1:2008cv01954
Filed: April 4, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Marvin E. Aspen
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/20/2011:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
August 5, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Nan R. Nolan on 8/5/2010.Mailed notice(lxs, )
August 3, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration 135 is denied. Motion terminated. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/3/2010:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
February 1, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 2/1/2010:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Chicago Police Officers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Maldonado
Represented By: Leslie C. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?