Eskew v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Debbie L. Eskew
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2008cv01978
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: LaSalle
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 10/12/2012: Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment 87 is denied for the reasons set forth in the Statement section of this Written Opinion. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice. (is, )
September 20, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 9/20/2012: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2412 74 is denied for the reasons set forth in the Statement section of this Written Opinion. [For further details see written opinion]. Mailed notice. (is, )
November 1, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 11/1/2010: Mailed notice. (is, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eskew v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie L. Eskew
Represented By: George Gerard Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?